This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:17:39 (UTC).

Rhodes v. Wyatt

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Rhodes filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wyatt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, West Virginia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas S. Kleeh and Michael John Aloi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00214

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Virginia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Kleeh

Referral Judge

Michael John Aloi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pamela Rhodes

Tunnelton, WV 26444

Defendant

John Wyatt

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/27/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

6 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#6

(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED In Forma Pauperis BE DENIED AND THIS ACTION BE DISMISSED. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Complaint #1 be dismissed for failure to state a claim over which the court has jurisdiction and Plaintiffs Motion (ECF No. 2) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, be DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation, file with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 1/24/2020. (copy pro se plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice and #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/7/19. (mh) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

4 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#4

(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL referring case to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 12/4/19. (mh) (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

3 #1

Certified Mail Return Receipt

#3

(#3) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Misc. Attachments

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against John Wyatt, filed by Pamela Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Misc. Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN RECEIPT as to #6 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 1/27/2020. (jmm) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION RECOMMENDING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO PROCEED In Forma Pauperis BE DENIED AND THIS ACTION BE DISMISSED. The Magistrate Judge RECOMMENDS that Plaintiffs Complaint #1 be dismissed for failure to state a claim over which the court has jurisdiction and Plaintiffs Motion (ECF No. 2) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, be DENIED. Within fourteen (14) days after being served with a copy of this Report and Recommendation, file with the Clerk of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi on 1/24/2020. (copy pro se plaintiff via certified mail)(jmm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/24/2020: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (jmm). (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN RECEIPT as to #3 Notice and #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. SERVICE ACCEPTED on 12/7/19. (mh) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF REFERRAL referring case to Magistrate Judge Michael John Aloi. Signed by District Judge Thomas S. Kleeh on 12/4/19. (mh) (Copy PS Plaintiff via cert mail) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of General Guidelines for Appearing Pro Se in Federal Court. (To PS Plaintiff via cert. mail) (mh) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/4/2019: #1 Certified Mail Return Receipt) (mh). (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ** SEALED** MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Pamela Rhodes. (mh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against John Wyatt, filed by Pamela Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Misc. Attachments, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(mh) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less