This case was last updated from PACER on 12/22/2019 at 07:37:35 (UTC).

RHODES v. PRAUSE et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2019 RHODES filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against PRAUSE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Maureen P. Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01366

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Maureen P. Kelly

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALEXANDER RHODES

Defendants

LIBEROS LLC

NICOLE PRAUSE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Alicia M. Schmitt

322 Richland Lane

Pittsburgh, PA 15208

Andrew C Stebbins

Attorney at Minc LLC

200 Park Avenue, Suite 200

Orange Village, OH 44122

Defendant Attorney

Philip J. Sbrolla

Attorney at Cipriani & Werner, P.C.

650 Washington Road, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

 

Court Documents

#12

11 #2

Proposed Order

11 #1

Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

4 #1

Affidavit Affidavit in Support on Mtn to Appear Pro Hac Vice

#4

#3

2 #1

Summons

#2

1 #3

Exhibit 2

1 #2

Exhibit 1

#1

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) BRIEF in Support re #11 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Sbrolla, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Attachments: #1 Certification and Notice for Filing Pretrial Motions, #2 Proposed Order) (Sbrolla, Philip) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Sbrolla, Philip) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER RHODES. NICOLE PRAUSE waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ALEXANDER RHODES. LIBEROS LLC waiver sent on 11/8/2019, answer due 1/7/2020. (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #7 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Party did not file disclosure statement as required pursuant L.R. 7.1.1. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to file statement within 7 days. Disclosure Statement due by 11/20/2019. (jm) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip J. Sbrolla on behalf of LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE. (Sbrolla, Philip) (Entered: 11/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #4 Motion for attorney Andrew Stebbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 11/07/2019. (tjw) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Errata re #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Attachment of Exhibit 1 to Affidavit by ALEXANDER RHODES. Reason for Correction: Failure to attach exhibit. (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) First MOTION for attorney Andrew Stebbins to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Motion to Appear (Filing fee $70, Receipt # 0315-5351186) by ALEXANDER RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support on Mtn to Appear Pro Hac Vice) (Stebbins, Andrew) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) As detailed in the accompanying Order, given that motions pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) are discouraged if the pleading defect is curable by amendment, IT HEREBY IS ORDERED that the parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of any motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. The duty to meet and confer extends to parties appearing pro se. Consistent with the foregoing, motions to dismiss must be accompanied by a certificate of the movant, stating that the moving party has made a good faith effort to confer with the nonmovant(s) to determine whether the identified pleading deficiencies properly may be cured by amendment. Motions to dismiss that do not contain the required certification will be summarily denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Maureen P. Kelly on 10/24/2019. (tjw) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE (Attachments: #1 Summons) (jm) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against LIBEROS LLC, NICOLE PRAUSE (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5331590), filed by ALEXANDER RHODES. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Summons LIBEROS LLC, #5 Summons PRAUSE) (jm) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LIBEROS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alicia M. Schmitt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew C Stebbins