This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:27:25 (UTC).

Rhodes v. Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Rhodes filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roderick C. Young and Robert J. Krask. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00332

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roderick C. Young

Referral Judge

Robert J. Krask

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

William P. Rhodes

Defendants

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Trans Union, LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Drew David Sarrett

Attorney at Consumer Litigation Associates, PC

626 East Broad Street, Suite 300

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant Attorneys

Stephen David Lozier

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

Gibson Sinclair Wright

Attorney at McCandlish Holton PC

1111 E Main St, Suite 2100

Richmond, VA 23218-0796

David Neal Anthony

Attorney at Troutman Pepper Hamilton Sanders LLP (Richmond)

Troutman Sanders Bldg, 1001 Haxall Point

Richmond, VA 23219

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

#7

6 #1

Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order)

#6

5 #1

Civil Motions Procedures

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Anthony, David) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE by William P. Rhodes Regarding Change of Firm for Drew Sarrett (Sarrett, Drew) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint by Trans Union, LLC.(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that Trans Union's Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint be, and hereby is, GRANTED, and it is further, ORDERED that Trans Union shall be GRANTED an extension of time until July 29, 2021, to file its Answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask and filed on 7/2/2021. (epri, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC. (Lozier, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to Complaint by Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC.(Lozier, Stephen) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Trans Union, LLC. (Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Trans Union, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wright, Gibson) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER denying #8 Motion for Pro hac vice for Kiersen Mariell Commons. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 6/30/21. (tlev, ) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER: It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Defendant, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., shall be GRANTED an extension of time until on or before August 6, 2021 to file its responsive pleadings, including its Answer, to the Complaint filed by William P. Rhodes. Copies of Order sent as DIRECTED on 6.29.21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask and filed on 6/29/2021. (epri, ) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Robert JKrask. #6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (epri, ) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kiersen Mariell Commons and Certification of Local Counsel David Neal Anthony Filing fee $ 75, receipt number AVAEDC-7863412. by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Anthony, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Agreed Order))(Anthony, David) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Three (3) Summonses Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc., Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC, Trans Union, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Motions Procedures)(epri, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Roderick C. Young and Magistrate Judge Robert J. Krask. (epri, ) (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons Issued as to: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by William P. Rhodes. (Sarrett, Drew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons Issued as to: Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC by William P. Rhodes. (Sarrett, Drew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons Issued as to: Trans Union, LLC by William P. Rhodes. (Sarrett, Drew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AVAEDC-7833931.), filed by William P. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sarrett, Drew) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Drew David Sarrett