This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/23/2020 at 09:11:33 (UTC).

Rhodes v. Equifax Information Services LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/24/2020 Rhodes filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax Information Services LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jon E DeGuilio and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00264

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jon E DeGuilio

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa A Rhodes

Defendants

Comenity Bank

Equifax Information Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M Smith

Attorney at Doherty Smith LLC

105 W Madison St Ste 1500

Chicago, IL 60602

Defendant Attorneys

Anna-Katrina S Christakis

Attorney at Pilgrim Christakis LLP

321 N Clark St 26Th Fl

Chicago, IL 60654

Steven D Brock

Attorney at Clark Hill PLC - Bir/MI

151 S Old Woodward Ave Suite 200

Birmingham, MI 48009

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Proposed Summons Equifax Information Services LLC

1 #2

Proposed Summons Comenity Bank

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#11

#13

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Equifax Information Services LLC.(Brock, Steven) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Comenity Bank answer due 6/10/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 5/13/20. (slm) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (AGREED) by Defendant Comenity Bank. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 05/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Equifax Information Services LLC answer due 5/18/2020. Approved by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 4/17/20. (slm) (Entered: 04/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Equifax Information Services LLC identifying Corporate Parent Equifax Information Services, LLC for Equifax Information Services LLC.. (Brock, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: per #7 Comenity Bank answer due 5/13/2020. (rmc) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Equifax Information Services LLC. (Brock, Steven) (Entered: 04/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Comenity Bank ; answer due by May 13, 2020. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Comenity Bank identifying Corporate Parent Alliance Data Systems Corporation for Comenity Bank.. (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Anna-Katrina S Christakis on behalf of Comenity Bank (Christakis, Anna-Katrina) (Entered: 04/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa A Rhodes. Equifax Information Services LLC served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Smith, James) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa A Rhodes. Comenity Bank served on 3/25/2020, answer due 4/15/2020. (Smith, James) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC and Comenity Bank. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nal) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • DocketJudge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. (nal) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4182164.), filed by Lisa A Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Equifax Information Services LLC, #2 Proposed Summons Comenity Bank, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, James) (Entered: 03/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Comenity Bank is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Michael Smith