This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/03/2023 at 19:07:29 (UTC).

Rhodes v. California Department of Parks and Recreation et al

Case Summary

On 01/23/2023 Rhodes filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against California Department of Parks and Recreation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Nathanael M. Cousins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:23-CV-00341

  • Filing Date:

    01/23/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shawn Rhodes

Defendants

California Department of Parks and Recreation

Jamie Stamps

Cameron Weaver

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Patrick Matthew Buelna

Justin Myers Thompson

Lateef Gray

Defendant Attorney

Jason R. Cale

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Buelna, Patrick) (Filed on 1/23/2023) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps, Cameron Weaver. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#5

(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shawn Rhodes.. (Thompson, Justin) (Filed on 2/7/2023) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jamie Stamps, California Department of Parks and Recreation. Service waived by Jamie Stamps waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; California Department of Parks and Recreation waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

#9

(#9) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thompson, Justin) (Filed on 4/3/2023) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#10

(#10) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 4/3/2023) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

#11

(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps, Cameron Weaver. Filed by Shawn Rhodes. (Thompson, Justin) (Filed on 4/11/2023) Modified on 4/12/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2023)

#12

(#12) Declaration of Jason R. Cale Regarding Responsive Pleading by California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps. (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 4/25/2023) Modified on 4/25/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2023)

#14

(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps.. (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2023) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps.. (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 4/26/2023) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2023
  • Docket(#13) CLERK'S NOTICE RE: Consent or Declination. Defendants are requested to file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: #http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. Consent/Declination due by 5/31/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2023) (Entered: 04/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Declaration of Jason R. Cale Regarding Responsive Pleading by California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps. (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 4/25/2023) Modified on 4/25/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps, Cameron Weaver. Filed by Shawn Rhodes. (Thompson, Justin) (Filed on 4/11/2023) Modified on 4/12/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 4/3/2023) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Thompson, Justin) (Filed on 4/3/2023) (Entered: 04/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • Docket(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE CONTINUING Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2023, to 6/7/2023, at 10:00 AM by telephone. Case Management Statement due by 5/31/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2023) (Entered: 03/30/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Jamie Stamps, California Department of Parks and Recreation. Service waived by Jamie Stamps waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023; California Department of Parks and Recreation waiver sent on 2/24/2023, answer due 4/25/2023. (Cale, Jason) (Filed on 2/24/2023) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Shawn Rhodes.. (Thompson, Justin) (Filed on 2/7/2023) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/19/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/26/2023 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps, Cameron Weaver. (cjl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 2/7/2023. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2023) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Buelna, Patrick) (Filed on 1/23/2023) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT for Damages (with jury demand) against California Department of Parks and Recreation, Jamie Stamps, Cameron Weaver (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17921361). Filed by Shawn Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Buelna, Patrick) (Filed on 1/23/2023) Modified on 1/24/2023 (cjl, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less