This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2020 at 11:47:45 (UTC).

Rhodes v. American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 et al

Case Summary

On 07/29/2020 Rhodes filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judge overseeing this case is Matthew W. Brann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01313

  • Filing Date:

    07/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ralph R. Rhodes

Defendants

American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13

David R. Fillman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Justin Thomas Miller

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North 3Rd Street, 2Nd Floor

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Nathan J. McGrath

Attorney at The Fairness Center

500 North Third Street, Floor 2

Harrisburg, PA 17101

Defendant Attorneys

Richard Griffin

Attorney at Bredhoff & Kaiser, PLLC

805 15Th Street Nw, Suite 1000

Washington, DC 20005

Amy L. Rosenberger

Attorney at Willig, Williams & Davidson

1845 Walnut Street, 24Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit(s)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons Packet

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER DISMISSING CASE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/26/2020. (jr) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ralph R. Rhodes (McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SPECIAL ADMISSION FORM APPROVED as to Attorney Richard Griffin Jr. Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/17/2020. (lg) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDOCKET ANNOTATION: Clerk verified DC bar record of Attorney Richard Griffin Jr. (lg) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Richard Griffin on behalf of American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13, David R. Fillman Attorney Richard F. Griffin, Jr. is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number APAMDC-5209589.. (Griffin, Richard) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13, David R. Fillman. (Rosenberger, Amy) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Amy L. Rosenberger on behalf of All Defendants (Rosenberger, Amy) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Ralph R. Rhodes. (McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ralph R. Rhodes. American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13 served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020; David R. Fillman served on 8/6/2020, answer due 8/27/2020. (McGrath, Nathan) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to Counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. (See Letter for further details.) Signed by Honorable Matthew W. Brann on 8/6/2020. (jr) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13, David R. Fillman and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: #1 Summons Packet) (nr) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against American Federation of State County and Municipal Employees, Council 13, David R. Fillman ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 5184567), filed by Ralph R. Rhodes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(nr) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AMERICAN FEDERATION OF STATE COUNTY AND MUNICIPAL EMPLOYEES LOCAL 619 DISTRICT COUNCIL 36 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan J. McGrath