This case was last updated from PACER on 02/15/2020 at 08:12:28 (UTC).

Rhoda et al v. SANOFI S.A. et al

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Rhoda filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against SANOFI S A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A Ruiz. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:19-CV-81681

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A Ruiz

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sheridan Rhoda

Jack Rhoda

Defendants

Chattem, Inc.

SANOFI S.A.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

George Tharin Williamson

Attorney at Farr, Farr, Emerich, Hackett, & Carr, P.A.

99 Nesbit Street

Punta Gorda, FL 33950

 

Court Documents

1 #5

Summon(s)

1 #4

Summon(s)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12236152, filed by Jack Rhoda, Sheridan Rhoda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Williamson, George) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Service must be perfected by 3/17/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #2

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., SANOFI S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#5

(#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jack Rhoda, Sheridan Rhoda (Williamson, George) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

1 #3

Summon(s)

#7

(#7) Order Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

1 #6

Summon(s)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Order Administratively Closing Case. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO PERFECT SERVICE. Service must be perfected by 3/17/2020. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz on 1/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (btr) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Jack Rhoda, Sheridan Rhoda (Williamson, George) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • Docket(#4) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Incorrect case opening information. The Filer selected the incorrect Jury demand when filing. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (pcs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., SANOFI S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (pcs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • (#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A Ruiz. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12236152, filed by Jack Rhoda, Sheridan Rhoda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Williamson, George) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.