This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2021 at 09:06:36 (UTC).

RHO Naalehu, LLC v. Chicago Title Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 RHO Naalehu, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Chicago Title Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Hawaii District. The Judges overseeing this case are HELEN GILLMOR and WES REBER PORTER. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00312

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

HELEN GILLMOR

WES REBER PORTER

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RHO Naalehu, LLC

Defendant

Chicago Title Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lisa Katherine Swartzfager

Attorney at Case Schutte LLP

1000 Bishop Street, Ste. 1200

Honolulu, HI 96813

Philip J. Leas

Attorney at Cades Schutte LLP

Cades Schutte Building, 1000 Bishop Street 12Th Flr

Honolulu, HI 96813

Defendant Attorney

Charles A. Price

Attorney at Koshiba Price & Gruebner

707 Richards Street, Suite 610

Honolulu, HI 96813

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re #10 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAI'I AND ORDER. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

#11

(#11) Transmittal Letter to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re: ECF No. #10 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAI'I AND ORDER, dated August 4, 2021 (jo) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

#10

(#10) STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAI'I AND ORDER - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Pursuant to the above Stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, the case and all files herein are REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawai'i for further proceedings. (jo) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

7 #2

Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Manageme

7 #1

Case Detail Docket List

#7

(#7) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; Case 1CCV-21-0000830 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS)) (jo) Modified to change the filing date on 7/21/2021 (jo) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Insurance Group, Inc. for Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Price, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

4 #1

Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures

#4

(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/23/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed June 25, 2021 in state court by Chicago Title Insurance Company.(Price, Charles) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits "A" - "C"; Certificate of Service by RHO Naalehu, LLC Chicago Title Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit of the State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-21-0000830. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0975-2553957), filed by RHO Naalehu, LLC. Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Price, Charles) Modified on 7/19/2021 (emt, ). Docket Text Modified on 7/19/2021 (jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re #10 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAI'I AND ORDER. (emt, ) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Transmittal Letter to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re: ECF No. #10 STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAI'I AND ORDER, dated August 4, 2021 (jo) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION TO REMAND CASE BACK TO THE CIRCUIT COURT OF THE FIRST CIRCUIT, STATE OF HAWAI'I AND ORDER - Signed by SENIOR JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Pursuant to the above Stipulation of the parties and good cause appearing, the case and all files herein are REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawai'i for further proceedings. (jo) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 21-00312 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • Docket(#8) EO: The Court directs the Clerk's Office to reassign this case to a district judge. Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter will remain as the magistrate judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; Case 1CCV-21-0000830 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS)) (jo) Modified to change the filing date on 7/21/2021 (jo) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chicago Title Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Fidelity National Title Insurance Group, Inc. for Chicago Title Insurance Company.. (Price, Charles) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADVISORY ENTRY-Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDF'S - Please be advised that the exhibits included in Document #1 Notice of Removal, are comprised of several exhibits and not submitted as separate pdf attachments. See Section 5.0 Exhibits, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document. No further action is necessary. (jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 8/23/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 7/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint filed June 25, 2021 in state court by Chicago Title Insurance Company.(Price, Charles) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00312 WRP on all further pleadings.(jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits "A" - "C"; Certificate of Service by RHO Naalehu, LLC Chicago Title Insurance Company from Circuit Court of the First Circuit of the State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-21-0000830. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0975-2553957), filed by RHO Naalehu, LLC. Chicago Title Insurance Company. (Price, Charles) Modified on 7/19/2021 (emt, ). Docket Text Modified on 7/19/2021 (jni) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHICAGO TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Charles A. Price