Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/19/2021 at 09:55:07 (UTC).

Rheem Manufacturing Company v. Navien, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/18/2021 Rheem Manufacturing Company filed an Other lawsuit against Navien, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John D. Early and Josephine L. Staton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00324

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John D. Early

Presiding Judge

Josephine L. Staton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rheem Manufacturing Company

Defendant

Navien, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thomas Gerard Connolly

Attorney at Harris Wiltshire and Grannis LLP

1919 M Street Nw, 8Th Floor

Washington, DC 20036

William Byrne Sullivan

Attorney at Harris Wiltshire and Grannis LLP

1919 M Street Nw Suite 800

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Scott J Pivnick

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

950 F Street Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Ryan W Koppelman

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Katherine Grayce Rubschlager

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

333 South Hope Street 16Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Samuel C. Merritt

Attorney at Alston and Bird LLP

101 South Tryon Street Suite 4000

Charlotte, NC 28280-4000

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #44 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 4/30/2021. (iv) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel C. Merritt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Navien, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31118365) #44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#43

(#43) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff: 7 days, Defendant: 10-15 days, filed by Plaintiff Rheem Manufacturing Company.. (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#42

(#42) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Grayce Rubschlager on behalf of Defendant Navien, Inc. (Attorney Katherine Grayce Rubschlager added to party Navien, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rubschlager, Katherine) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

#41

(#41) DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Application for Continuance of Rule 26(F) Scheduling Conference #40 . ***The Court DENIES the parties Application to Continue the Schedule Conference. This denial is without prejudice. The parties are directed to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report two weeks in advance of the Scheduling Conference. Most cases do not require a conference, and the Court sets a schedule based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. The Court will vacate or continue the Scheduling Conference after reviewing the Rule 26(f) Report.*** (jp) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rheem Manufacturing Company, identifying Paloma Rheem Global, Inc.. (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice of William Byrne Sullivan. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/27/2020. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice of Mark Daniel Davis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/27/2020. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#7

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice of Mark Daniel Davis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/27/2020. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#6

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice of William Byrne Sullivan. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/27/2020. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2020)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rheem Manufacturing Company Navien, Inc. served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#4

(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice #44 by Judge Josephine L. Staton. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by 4/30/2021. (iv) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel C. Merritt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Navien, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31118365) #44 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(a) Application not complete: state and/or federal courts to which the applicant has been admitted are not listed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.3(d) Certificate of Good Standing not attached for every state court listed to which the applicant has been admitted. (lt) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Initial Disclosures filed by Defendant Navien, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) **STRICKEN** APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel C. Merritt to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Navien, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31118365) filed by Defendant Navien, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Koppelman, Ryan) Modified on 4/16/2021 Per Response #47 (iv). (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial Plaintiff: 7 days, Defendant: 10-15 days, filed by Plaintiff Rheem Manufacturing Company.. (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Katherine Grayce Rubschlager on behalf of Defendant Navien, Inc. (Attorney Katherine Grayce Rubschlager added to party Navien, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rubschlager, Katherine) (Entered: 04/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) DENIED BY ORDER OF THE COURT by Judge Josephine L. Staton re Application for Continuance of Rule 26(F) Scheduling Conference #40 . ***The Court DENIES the parties Application to Continue the Schedule Conference. This denial is without prejudice. The parties are directed to file their Joint Rule 26(f) Report two weeks in advance of the Scheduling Conference. Most cases do not require a conference, and the Court sets a schedule based on the parties' Rule 26(f) Report. The Court will vacate or continue the Scheduling Conference after reviewing the Rule 26(f) Report.*** (jp) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Scheduling Conference from 4/23/2021 at 10:30 AM to 4/30/2021 at 10:30 AM filed by Defendant Navien, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan W. Koppelman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Koppelman, Ryan) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rheem Manufacturing Company, identifying Paloma Rheem Global, Inc.. (Sullivan, William) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) RESPONSE filed by Pro Hac Vice attorney Thomas Gerard Connolly on behalf of Plaintiff Rheem Manufacturing Company. RE: Notice of Filing Fee Due. PHV fee N/A. At this time, I am not appearing as an attorney of record. If such an appearance becomes necessary, I will file a motion for admission pro hac vice as required by the Local Rules. (lt) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice of William Byrne Sullivan. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/27/2020. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro hac vice of Mark Daniel Davis. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 10/27/2020. (lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mark Daniel Davis and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas G. Connolly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7461469. by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by William Byrne Sullivan and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas G. Connolly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7461371. by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rheem Manufacturing Company Navien, Inc. served on 10/12/2020, answer due 11/2/2020 (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Navien, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(lcre, ) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7437471.), filed by Rheem Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connolly, Thomas) [Transferred from Virginia Eastern on 2/19/2021.] (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Navien, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RHEEM MANUFACTURING COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel Clinton Merritt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott J Pivnick