This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/16/2022 at 07:04:42 (UTC).

RH Kids, LLC v. National Default Servicing Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/15/2022 RH Kids, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against National Default Servicing Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andrew P. Gordon and Nancy J. Koppe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00954

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andrew P. Gordon

Referral Judge

Nancy J. Koppe

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RH Kids, LLC

Defendants

National Default Servicing Corporation

Specialized Loan Servicing LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Y Hong

Attorney at Hong & Hong Law Office

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 650

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant Attorney

Krista Nielson

Attorney at Tiffany & Bosco, P.A.

10100 W. Charleston Blvd., Ste 220

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

6 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I-Notice of Posting Bond

6 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H-NOE - TPO

6 #7

Exhibit Exhibit G-TPO

6 #6

Exhibit Exhibit F-NOE - OST

6 #5

Exhibit Exhibit E-Motion for TPO

6 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D-AOS-Specialized Loan

6 #3

Exhibit C-Notice of Lis Pendens

6 #2

Exhibit B-Summons

6 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by National Default Servicing Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC added. (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/15/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/30/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit Exhibit I-Notice of Posting Bond

1 #8

Exhibit Exhibit H-NOE - TPO

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit D-AOS-Specialized Loan

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B-Summons

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First AMENDED PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-22-852833-C, by National Default Servicing Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit C-Notice of Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-AOS-Specialized Loan, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Motion for TPO, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-NOE - OST, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-TPO, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-NOE - TPO, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I-Notice of Posting Bond) (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by National Default Servicing Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Specialized Loan Servicing LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Computershare Limited for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC added. (Nielson, Krista) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/15/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/30/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 7/15/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (EDS) (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Clark County District Court, Case Number A-22-852833-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BNVDC-6940890) by National Default Servicing Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. Proof of service due by 8/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B-Summons, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C-Lis Pendens, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D-AOS-Specialized Loan, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E-Motion for TPO, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F-NOE - OST, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G-TPO, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H-NOE - TPO, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I-Notice of Posting Bond, #10 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Nielson, Krista) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 06/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NATIONAL DEFAULT SERVICING CORPORATIOIN is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Krista Nielson