This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2023 at 08:54:48 (UTC).

RH Kids, LLC v. MTC Financial, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 RH Kids, LLC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against MTC Financial, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gloria M. Navarro and Brenda Weksler. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01999

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gloria M. Navarro

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RH Kids, LLC

Defendants

MTC Financial, Inc. doing business as Trustee Corps

Nationstar Mortgage, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Y Hong

Attorney at Hong & Hong Law Office

1980 Festival Plaza Drive, Suite 650

Las Vegas, NV 89135

Defendant Attorney

Nathan Smith

Attorney at Malcolm & Cisneros, A Law Corporation

2112 Business Center Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Certificate of Service

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Mr. Cooper. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Mr. Cooper.. (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Seek Actual Damages Pursuant to NRS 107.300 by RH Kids, LLC.. (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

#6

(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/1/2022. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/16/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

7 #7

Main Document

7 #1

Exhibit Exhibit "1"

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit "2"

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter a judgment awarding Plaintiff $3,375.00 in attorneys fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is hereby remanded to the Clark County District Court for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified Order and Docket to 8th JD - TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#9

(#9) JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of RH Kids, LLC against MTC Financial, Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. in the amount of $3,375.00. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in favor of RH Kids, LLC against MTC Financial, Inc. and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. in the amount of $3,375.00. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #7 Motion to Remand to State Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is instructed to enter a judgment awarding Plaintiff $3,375.00 in attorneys fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is hereby remanded to the Clark County District Court for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - certified Order and Docket to 8th JD - TRW) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff RH Kids, LLC. Responses due by 1/3/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit Exhibit "2")(Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 12/20/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/1/2022. By Deputy Clerk: L. Ortiz. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/16/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 12/31/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (LOE) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Seek Actual Damages Pursuant to NRS 107.300 by RH Kids, LLC.. (Hong, Joseph) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Mr. Cooper.. (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Mr. Cooper. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Smith, Nathan) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-22-860823-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7132059) by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC dba Mr. Cooper. Proof of service due by 2/1/2023. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certificate of Service) (Smith, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MTC FINANCIAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nathan Smith