This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2019 at 09:36:22 (UTC).

R.F.M. v. Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana et al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2019 R F M filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Guam District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr and Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Guam District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr

Presiding Judge

Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

RFM

R.F.M.

Defendants

Does Individuals 6-50

Boy Scouts of America

Capuchin Franciscans Custody of Star of the Sea

Doe Entities 1-5

Capuchin Franciscans Province of St. Mary

Capuchin Franciscans

Edward Perriera

Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana

Louis Brouillard

Boy Scouts of America Aloha Council Chamorro District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael J. Berman

Attorney at Berman, O'Connor and Mann

Suite 503, Bank Of Guam Building, 111 Chalan Santo Papa

Hagatna, GU 96910

Defendant Attorneys

G. Patrick Civille (non-CJA)

Attorney at Law Offices of Civille & Tang

330 Hernan Cortez Ave., Suite 200, 472-8868/9, Fax: 477-2511

Hagatna, GU 96910

Vincent Cristobal Camacho

Attorney at Camacho Calvo Law Group LLC

134 W Soledad Ave, Ste 401

Hagatna, GU 96910

John Coulter Terlaje

Attorney at Attorney at Law

Ste. 216, Former Union Bank Bldg., 194 Hernan Cortes Avenue

Hagatna, GU 96910

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) First Amended Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants., filed by R.F.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

#2

(#3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 4/25/2019. Joint Status Conference before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Stay extended until July 1, 2019. Court to provide list of possible settlement judges by 5/3/2019. Continued Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Veronica Flores.) (fad, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

1 #1

Superior court case

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV251-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-472108), filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Superior court case)(Terlaje, John) (Entered: 04/13/2019)

2 #2

Exhibit 2

#3

(#4) Order. Stay extended to 7/1/2019 for non-bankruptcy parties. Requests to complete service of process on the unserved defendants during this interim period granted. The court grants the various Plaintiffs' requests to file amended complaints to the extent that such amendment would not violate the automatic stay imposed in the bankruptcy proceeding. The court sets this matter for a continued status hearing on June 27, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. Any counsel not previously admitted to the bar of this court shall file the appropriate admission application sufficiently in advance of the next status hearing or risk not being permitted to participate in the next status hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 4/25/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

#5

(#6) Writ of Certiorari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 5/22/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#4

(#5) Order. Counsel for parties to advise the court via email whether they are interested in availing themselves of the services of the circuit mediators, at no cost. Responses due no later than 5/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/10/2019. (vtk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

2 #1

Exhibit 1

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Writ of Certiorari. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joaquin V.E. Manibusan, Jr on 5/22/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order. Counsel for parties to advise the court via email whether they are interested in availing themselves of the services of the circuit mediators, at no cost. Responses due no later than 5/14/2019. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 5/10/2019. (vtk) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Order. Stay extended to 7/1/2019 for non-bankruptcy parties. Requests to complete service of process on the unserved defendants during this interim period granted. The court grants the various Plaintiffs' requests to file amended complaints to the extent that such amendment would not violate the automatic stay imposed in the bankruptcy proceeding. The court sets this matter for a continued status hearing on June 27, 2019, at 8:30 a.m. Any counsel not previously admitted to the bar of this court shall file the appropriate admission application sufficiently in advance of the next status hearing or risk not being permitted to participate in the next status hearing. Signed by Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood on 4/25/2019. (fad, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 4/25/2019. Joint Status Conference before Chief Judge Frances M. Tydingco-Gatewood and Superior Court Judge Michael J. Bordallo. Stay extended until July 1, 2019. Court to provide list of possible settlement judges by 5/3/2019. Continued Status hearing set for 6/27/2019 at 8:30 a.m. (Court Reporter Veronica Flores.) (fad, ) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) First Amended Complaint for Damages - Jury Trial Demanded against All Defendants., filed by R.F.M.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Berman, Michael) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana from Superior Court of Guam, case number CV251-19. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0993-472108), filed by Roman Catholic Archbishop of Agana. Scheduling Notice due to be issued by 5/20/2019. (Attachments: #1 Superior court case)(Terlaje, John) (Entered: 04/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.