This case was last updated from PACER on 10/05/2020 at 10:17:16 (UTC).

RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Silent Partner Technologies, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2020 RFID Technology Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas P. Barber and Amanda Arnold Sansone. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01829

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas P. Barber

Referral Judge

Amanda Arnold Sansone

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

RFID Technology Innovations, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Silent Partner Technologies, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Jay B. Johnson

Attorney at Kizzia Johnson, PLLC

Suite 13000, 1910 Pacific Ave.

Dallas, TX 75201

Edward O'Connor

Attorney at Avyno Law P.C.

301 Clematis St., Suite 3000

West Palm Beach, FL 33401

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorney

Eleanor Trotman Barnett

Attorney at Waldman Barnett, PL

3250 Mary St. Ste 102

Coconut Grove, FL 33133

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against RFID Technology Innovations, LLC by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC.(Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#13

(#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Trotman Barnett on behalf of Silent Partner Technologies, LLC (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. Related case(s): yes (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management for RFID Technology Innovations, LLC.. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

#9

(#9) RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC as to Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

#8

(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#7

(#7) TERMINATED. PROOF of service by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC (O'Connor, Edward) NOTE: Counsel notified to refile using correct event code; summons returned executed. Modified on 8/21/2020 (LD). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

#6

(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/17/2020. (SRC) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#4

(#4) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Statement by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC.(MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Silent Partner Technologies, LLC with Jury Demand. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA061577 ) filed by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ENDORSED ORDER: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a) and the "Joint Stipulation of Dismissal" (Doc. #18), all claims asserted by Plaintiff in this action are dismissed with prejudice and all claims asserted by Defendant in this action are dismissed without prejudice, with all parties to bear their own attorney's fees and costs. The Clerk is directed to terminate any pending motions and deadlines, and thereafter close this case. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/23/2020. (EKB) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION of Dismissal by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Johnson, Jay) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings of Invalidity by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ENDORSED ORDER: "Silent Partner Technologies, LLC's Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim" (Doc. #14) is hereby denied as moot in light of Defendant's answer to the complaint. See (Doc. #15); see, e.g., Gaby's Bags, LLC v. Mercari, Inc., No. 2:19-cv-785-FtM-38MRM, 2020 WL 495215, at *6 (M.D. Fla. Jan. 30, 2020) (collecting cases). Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 9/9/2020. (EKB) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against RFID Technology Innovations, LLC by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC.(Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Trotman Barnett on behalf of Silent Partner Technologies, LLC (Barnett, Eleanor) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #6 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. Related case(s): yes (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Patent Asset Management for RFID Technology Innovations, LLC.. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN of service executed on 8/13/2020 by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC as to Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (O'Connor, Edward) (Entered: 08/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL regarding jury trials. (SRC) (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TERMINATED. PROOF of service by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC (O'Connor, Edward) NOTE: Counsel notified to refile using correct event code; summons returned executed. Modified on 8/21/2020 (LD). (Entered: 08/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Barber on 8/17/2020. (SRC) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE to counsel Jay B. Johnson of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Patent Report sent to Alexandria, VA. (MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to Silent Partner Technologies, LLC. (MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of filing of Plaintiff's Rule 7.1 Statement by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC.(MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Silent Partner Technologies, LLC with Jury Demand. ( Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number TPA061577 ) filed by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCB) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less