This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/04/2020 at 11:43:07 (UTC).

RFID Technology Innovations, LLC v. Real Asset Management, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/05/2020 RFID Technology Innovations, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Real Asset Management, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams, Robert W. Pratt and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00176

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judges

Robert W. Pratt

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RFID Technology Innovations, LLC

Defendant

Real Asset Management, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William J. Hale

Attorney at GOOSMANN LAW FIRM PLC (OMAHA)

17838 Burke Street, Suite 250

Omaha, NE 68118

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew W. Alexander

Attorney at CALFEE HALTER & GRISWOLD LLP

The Calfee Building, 1405 East Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Mark Wallace McDougall

Attorney at CALFEE HALTER & GRISWOLD LLP

The Calfee Building, 1405 East Sixth Street

Cleveland, OH 44114

Michael C. Richards

Attorney at DAVIS BROWN LAW FIRM (DSM)

215 10Th Street, Suite 1300

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A - '689 Patent

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

4 #1

Complaint

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC (Hale, William) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mark McDougall; granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew Alexander. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 7/14/2020. (kjw) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4188511 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Real Asset Management, Inc.. (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number: 0863-4188493 Fee paid in the amount of $100. by Real Asset Management, Inc.. (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Real Asset Management, Inc.. (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 07/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Real Asset Management, Inc. answer due 8/3/2020. (kmc) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall file an answer or appropriate motion by 8/3/2020. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Helen C. Adams on 6/29/2020. (imk) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unresisted MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion or Plead by Real Asset Management, Inc..Motions referred to Helen C. Adams. Responses due by 7/13/2020. (Richards, Michael) (Entered: 06/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Hale, William) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) See Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (kmc) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached summons and/or corporate disclosure packet, if applicable. In compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons and Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for plaintiff 6/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 LR 7.1 Packet) (kmc) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • DocketJudge Stephanie M. Rose added. Senior Judge Robert W. Pratt no longer assigned to case. (slg) (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT AO120 Report on Filing of a Patent Action by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. (Hale, William) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COPYRIGHT/PATENT/TRADEMARK COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-4153860., filed by RFID Technology Innovations, LLC. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 9/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - '689 Patent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hale, William) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Real Asset Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where RFID Technology Innovations, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mark W. McDougall

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrew Walton Alexander