Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/17/2021 at 07:59:07 (UTC).

Rezainia v. Kroger Texas L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Rezainia filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Texas L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David Hittner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-01633

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David Hittner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Roya Rezainia

Houston, TX 77055

Defendants

Kroger Texas L.P.

Redstone Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chelsea Elizabeth Murfree

Attorney at Ramji Law Group

9186 Katy Freeway

Houston, TX 77055

Milton G Hammond

Attorney at Ramji Law Group PC

9186 Katy Fwy

Houston, TX 77055

Defendant Attorneys

Adraon DelJohn Greene

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr And Smith

1301 Mckinney St, Ste 1400

Houston, TX 77010

Kelsi Michelle Wade

Attorney at Galloway Johnson Tompkins Burr & Smith

1301 Mckinney Street, Suite 1400

Houston, TX 77010

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kroger Texas L.P., filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

6 #1

Exhibit EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURE

#6

(#6) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Roya Rezainia, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURE)(Hammond, Milton) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

#5

(#5) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Kroger Texas L.P., filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#4

(#4) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Roya Rezainia, filed.(Hammond, Milton) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas L.P., filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

#2

(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

1 #9

Exhibit E

1 #8

Exhibit D-4

1 #7

Exhibit D-3

1 #6

Exhibit D-2

1 #5

Exhibit D-1

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court for Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-11088 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26457822) filed by Kroger Texas L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit E)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Kroger Texas L.P., filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Roya Rezainia, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBITS TO PLAINTIFFS INITIAL DISCLOSURE)(Hammond, Milton) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) INITIAL DISCLOSURES by Kroger Texas L.P., filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) First CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Roya Rezainia, filed.(Hammond, Milton) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Kroger Texas L.P., filed.(Wade, Kelsi) (Entered: 05/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/29/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray. (Signed by Judge David Hittner) Parties notified.(JosephWellsadi, 4) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 333rd District Court for Harris County, Texas, case number 2021-11088 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26457822) filed by Kroger Texas L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit D-1, #6 Exhibit D-2, #7 Exhibit D-3, #8 Exhibit D-4, #9 Exhibit E)(Greene, Adraon) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Redstone Group Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Kroger Texas LP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adraon DelJohn Greene