This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2020 at 08:05:22 (UTC).

Reynolds v. St. Jude Children's Research Hospital

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Reynolds filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against St Jude Children's Research Hospital. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheryl H. Lipman and Diane K. Vescovo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02771

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sheryl H. Lipman

Referral Judge

Diane K. Vescovo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brenda Reynolds

Defendant

St. Jude Children's Research Hospital

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kathleen L. Caldwell

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KATHLEEN L. CALDWELL

Lipscomb & Pitts Building, 2670 Union Extended, Suite 110

Memphis, TN 38112

Defendant Attorneys

Lisa A. Krupicka

Attorney at BURCH PORTER & JOHNSON

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103-2217

Gary Scott Peeples

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 North Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #4

Summons

#2

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#14

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for Tuesday, January 7, 2020 at 9:15 AM in Courtroom 1 - Memphis before Judge Sheryl H. Lipman. (smm) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #11 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/4/2019. (shl) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (Proposed Order Submitted) by St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER DENYING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION #9 FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Sheryl H. Lipman on 12/3/2019. (shl) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint and Incorporated Memorandum in Support (Proposed Order Submitted) by St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Gary Scott Peeples on behalf of All Defendants (Peeples, Gary) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa A. Krupicka on behalf of All Defendants (Krupicka, Lisa) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to St. Jude Children's Research Hospital. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jae) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Judge Sheryl H. Lipman and Chief Magistrate Judge Diane K. Vescovo added. (jae) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against St. Jude Children's Research Hospital (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3211674), filed by Brenda Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summons)(Caldwell, Kathleen) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST JUDE CHILDRENS RESEARCH HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa A. Krupicka