This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/28/2020 at 09:00:13 (UTC).

Reynolds v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/29/2020 Reynolds filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00403

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOY REYNOLDS

Defendants

Medtronic Logistics, LLC

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co.

Medtronic, Inc.

Medtronic USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jami S Oliver

Attorney at Oliver Law Offices, Inc.

7240 Muirfield Drive, Suite 120

Dublin, OH 43017

Ellen A Presby

Attorney at Van Wey, Presby & Williams PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75230

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic, Inc. on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic USA, Inc. on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. on 9/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic Logistics, LLC on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

3 #1

Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - Presby

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7686969) of Ellen Presby by Plaintiff Joy Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - Presby) (Oliver, Jami) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. (srb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

1 #6

Summons Form Summons Medtronic PR Operations Co

1 #5

Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC LOGISTICS LLC

1 #4

Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC USA, INC.

1 #3

Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC, INC.

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit COMBINED 1-16

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7680497), filed by JOY REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMBINED 1-16, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC, INC., #4 Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC USA, INC., #5 Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC LOGISTICS LLC, #6 Summons Form Summons Medtronic PR Operations Co) (Oliver, Jami) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic, Inc. on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic USA, Inc. on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. on 9/30/2020, answer due 12/29/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Medtronic Logistics, LLC on 9/30/2020, answer due 11/30/2020. (Presby, Ellen) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ellen A. Presby. Signed by Judge Thomas M. Rose on 10/5/2020. (srb) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7686969) of Ellen Presby by Plaintiff Joy Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing - Presby) (Oliver, Jami) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic USA, Inc., Medtronic Logistics, LLC, Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. (srb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • Docket...If this case is referred it will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Newman... (srb) (Entered: 09/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7680497), filed by JOY REYNOLDS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit COMBINED 1-16, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC, INC., #4 Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC USA, INC., #5 Summons Form SUMMONS MEDTRONIC LOGISTICS LLC, #6 Summons Form Summons Medtronic PR Operations Co) (Oliver, Jami) (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jami S Oliver