This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2020 at 07:52:07 (UTC).

Reynolds v. Hutchinson et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Reynolds filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Hutchinson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy S. Black and Karen L. Litkovitz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00952

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Black

Referral Judge

Karen L. Litkovitz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Reynolds

Lucasville, OH 45699

Defendants

C.O. Evans

C.O. Hutchinson

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Reynolds. (cb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER - Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to pay $400 ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) or submit to the Court an in forma pauperis application and certified copy of plaintiffs prison trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the preceding six-month period within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/14/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Evans, Hutchinson, filed by Robert Reynolds (Scanned as received without IFP Form, Summons Forms, USM-285 Forms, or Service Copies of the Complaint). (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 11/13/2019 (bjc). Modified on 11/13/2019 (eh). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Robert Reynolds. (cb) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DEFICIENCY ORDER - Plaintiff is therefore ORDERED to pay $400 ($350 filing fee plus $50 administrative fee) or submit to the Court an in forma pauperis application and certified copy of plaintiffs prison trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent) for the preceding six-month period within thirty (30) days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz on 11/14/2019. (bjc)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Evans, Hutchinson, filed by Robert Reynolds (Scanned as received without IFP Form, Summons Forms, USM-285 Forms, or Service Copies of the Complaint). (bjc) Modified Docket Text on 11/13/2019 (bjc). Modified on 11/13/2019 (eh). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where C.O. Evans is a litigant