This case was last updated from PACER on 09/14/2020 at 09:32:13 (UTC).

Reynolds v. Clark et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 Reynolds filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Clark. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard D. Bennett. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02087

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard D. Bennett

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Barbara Reynolds

Defendants

Tokio Marine America Insurance Company

Aja Imani Clark

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William Trevillian, Jr

Attorney at William C Trevillian PA

7865 Quarterfield Rd

Severn, MD 21144

Defendant Attorney

Anthony Michael Conti

Attorney at Conti Fenn LLC

36 S Charles St Ste 2501

Baltimore, MD 21201

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/27/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

4 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Michael Conti on behalf of Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Aja Imani Clark, Tokio Marine America Insurance Company.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

1 #3

Summons Defendant Tokio Marine

1 #2

Summons Defendant Aja Clark

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8758836.), filed by Barbara Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Aja Clark, #3 Summons Defendant Tokio Marine)(Trevillian, William) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 8/27/2020. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDeficiency Notice to Defendant Tokio Marine America Insurance Company -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 9/3/2020 (dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Tokio Marine America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Michael Conti on behalf of Tokio Marine America Insurance Company (Conti, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued 21 days as to Aja Imani Clark, Tokio Marine America Insurance Company.(krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8758836.), filed by Barbara Reynolds. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Defendant Aja Clark, #3 Summons Defendant Tokio Marine)(Trevillian, William) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less