This case was last updated from PACER on 03/26/2019 at 07:37:42 (UTC).

REYNOLDS v. ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 REYNOLDS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maine District. The Judges overseeing this case are JOHN H. RICH III and JON D. LEVY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00045

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maine District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

JOHN H. RICH III

Presiding Judge

JON D. LEVY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS

Defendants and Counter Claimants

CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY

ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

STEVEN D. SILIN

Attorney at BERMAN & SIMMONS, P.A.

P. O. Box 961, 784-3576, Fax: 784-7699

Lewiston, ME 04243

ROBERT FURBISH

Attorney at BERMAN & SIMMONS, P.A.

P. O. Box 961

Lewiston, ME 04243

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

JOSHUA E. BIROCCO

Attorney at TUCKER LAW GROUP

One Cumberland Place, Ste 308, P.O. Box 696

Bangor, ME 04402

MAXWELL B. FEIT

Attorney at RUBIN & RUDMAN, LLP

53 State Street, 15Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

JOHN J. MCGIVNEY

Attorney at RUBIN & RUDMAN, LLP

53 State Street, 15Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

MICHAEL D RISEBERG

Attorney at RUBIN & RUDMAN, LLP

53 State Street, 15Th Floor

Boston, MA 02109

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) First MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 3/21/2019. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

#17

(#17) Reply to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #4 by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

16 #2

Supplement

16 #1

Supplement

#16

(#16) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Riseberg, John McGivney, Maxwell Feit filed by JOSHUA E. BIROCCO on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1977793.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(BIROCCO, JOSHUA) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/27/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/5/2019. Motions due by 7/18/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/10/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

#14

(#14) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

#13

(#13) AFFIDAVIT filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 State Court Record .. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 to replace "Additional Attachments" with "Affidavit" (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. All Defendants. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#5

(#5) ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. All Defendants. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

#4

(#17) Reply to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #4 by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

#3

(#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 2/4/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

1 #4

summons

1 #3

service of process

1 #2

notice regarding electronic service

1 #1

complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number BANSCCV 2018-159. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/25/2019) Fee due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 notice regarding electronic service, #3 service of process, #4 summons)(bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2019
  • Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines : Discovery due by 9/30/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 10/7/2019. Motions due by 10/21/2019. Ready for Trial on 12/3/2019. (akr) (Entered: 03/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER granting in part #18 Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. On March 11, 2019, I held a telephonic hearing in this reach-and-apply action on the parties' joint motion to extend certain pretrial deadlines with Attorney Furbish for the plaintiff and Attorneys Riseberg, Feit, and Birocco for the defendants. After discussion, I agreed to extend the deadlines by approximately three months, as requested, through the parties' expert disclosure deadlines, but applied the court's customary intervals thereafter. Accordingly, the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 15, is amended as follows: initial disclosures shall be served by April 15, 2019; the plaintiff shall disclose her experts by July 30, 2019; and, the defendants shall disclose their experts by August 30, 2019. The remaining pretrial deadlines shall be set according to the court's customary intervals as follows: discovery to be completed by September 30, 2019; the plaintiff's written demand and the defendants' written response shall be served by September 16 and 30, 2019, respectively; any Local Rule 56(h) notice to be filed by October 7, 2019; the dispositive/Daubert/Kumho motions deadline is reset to October 21, 2019; and the case shall be removed from the September trial list and placed on the December trial list, to be trial-ready by December 3, 2019. All other limitations and deadlines in the court's scheduling order, ECF No. 15, shall otherwise remain in effect. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • (#20) Minute Entry for proceedings held before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III: Hearing held on 3/11/2019 re: ECF No. 18; docket order to follow. (Court Reporter: FTR) (RICH III, JOHN) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #18 First MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order: Telephone Conference set for 3/11/2019 at 03:00 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. Counsel are instructed to call chambers at the number provided once all the parties are on the line. (slg) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) First MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY Responses due by 3/21/2019. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Reply to Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim #4 by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) CERTIFICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Michael Riseberg, John McGivney, Maxwell Feit filed by JOSHUA E. BIROCCO on behalf of All Defendants (Total admission fee $ 300 receipt number 0100-1977793.) (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(BIROCCO, JOSHUA) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/27/2019. Written Notice of Intent to File Summary Judgment Motion and Request for Pre-Filing Conference due by 7/5/2019. Motions due by 7/18/2019. Ready for Trial on 9/10/2019. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN H. RICH III. (akr) (Entered: 02/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by MILDRED HELEN REYNOLDS. (FURBISH, ROBERT) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) AFFIDAVIT filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY re #10 State Court Record .. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 to replace "Additional Attachments" with "Affidavit" (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ***FILED IN ERROR*** CIVIL COVER SHEET Penobscot County Superior Court. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY. All Defendants. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ***FILED IN ERROR*** SUMMONS Returned Executed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. All Defendants. (BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 (akr). (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Plaintiff by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY and CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY.(BIROCCO, JOSHUA) Modified on 2/4/2019 to add CHUBB as filer and counterclaimant (akr). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0100-1965831.), filed by ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY.(BIROCCO, JOSHUA) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Set Answer Deadline for ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY, CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY : Answer due by 2/1/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Set Deadlines : Per Local Rule 7.1 Notice of Interested Parties or Corporate Disclosure Statement due by 2/4/2019. (bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 2/4/2019. By DEPUTY CLERK: Robert Allen. (bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET. (bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Penobscot County Superior Court, case number BANSCCV 2018-159. PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS., filed by CHUBB INDEMNITY INSURANCE COMPANY, ACE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. (Service of Process Deadline 4/25/2019) Fee due by 1/28/2019. (Attachments: #1 complaint, #2 notice regarding electronic service, #3 service of process, #4 summons)(bfa) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less