This case was last updated from PACER on 11/23/2019 at 07:27:26 (UTC).

Reynolds et al v. Crites et al

Case Summary

On 09/24/2019 Reynolds filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Crites. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00367

  • Filing Date:

    09/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Steven Reynolds

Judith Reynolds

Defendants

Salmon Falls Field Services

Ralph Crites

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel E. Thenell

Attorney at Thenell Law Group

12909 Sw 68Th Parkway, Suite 290

Portland, OR 97223

Defendant Attorneys

Michael W Moore

Attorney at MOORE ELIA KRAFT & HALL, LLP

Po Box 6756

Boise, ID 83707

Michael J Elia

Attorney at Moore Elia Kraft & Hall, LLP

702 W. Idaho Street Suite #800, Po Box 6756

Boise, ID 83702

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Judith Reynolds, Steven Reynolds Notice of Assignment to Magistrate and Consent Form (Thenell, Daniel)

#12

(#12) DISCOVERY PLAN by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services Joint. (Elia, Michael)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services. (Elia, Michael)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Reynolds, Judith Reynolds. Ralph Crites served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Thenell, Daniel)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Reynolds, Judith Reynolds. Salmon Falls Field Services served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Thenell, Daniel)

#7

(#7) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before November 5, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services.(Elia, Michael)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services. (Elia, Michael)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ralph Crites, Judith Reynolds, Steven Reynolds, Salmon Falls Field Services re #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2019. (alw)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Elia on behalf of Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services (Elia, Michael)

2 #1

Summons

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1943782.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Thenell, Daniel)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by Judith Reynolds, Steven Reynolds Notice of Assignment to Magistrate and Consent Form (Thenell, Daniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) DISCOVERY PLAN by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services Joint. (Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services. (Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • (#10) AMENDED DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Hearing: Per the request of counsel in this matter, the Telephonic Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/12/2019 11:30 AM MT is hereby VACATED and RE-SET for 11/25/2019 10:00 AM MT Telephonic Hearing - Boise Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Counsel for Plaintiff to initiate the conference call and when all parties are on the line, connect with the courtroom at 208-334-9945. Stipulated Litigation and Discovery Plans to be filed on or before 11/18/2019. (at)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Reynolds, Judith Reynolds. Ralph Crites served on 10/2/2019, answer due 10/23/2019. (Thenell, Daniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Steven Reynolds, Judith Reynolds. Salmon Falls Field Services served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Thenell, Daniel)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2019 11:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. On or before November 5, 2019, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services.(Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services. (Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • NOTICE TO COURT that counsel Brady J. Hall wishes to no longer be noticed electronically on this case as of the date of this notice. (Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Ralph Crites, Judith Reynolds, Steven Reynolds, Salmon Falls Field Services re #3 Notice of Appearance, #1 Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 12/3/2019. (alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J Elia on behalf of Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services (Elia, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Ralph Crites, Salmon Falls Field Services. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons)(jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1943782.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Thenell, Daniel)

    Read MoreRead Less