This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/28/2020 at 10:46:18 (UTC).

Reyes v. NAR Inc et al

Case Summary

On 01/27/2020 Reyes filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against NAR Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Howard C. Nielson, Jr and Evelyn J. Furse. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00007

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Howard C. Nielson, Jr

Referral Judge

Evelyn J. Furse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patricia Reyes

Defendants

NAR Inc

Olson Associates

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ronald Ady

8 E Broadway Ste 725

Salt Lake City, UT 84111

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse on 1/29/2020. (las) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • Docket(#3) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Evelyn J. Furse under 28:636 (b)(1)(A), Magistrate to hear and determine all nondispositive pretrial matters. No attached document. Signed by Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr. on 1/28/2020. (las) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1088-3472333) filed by Patricia Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff) Assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr (Ady, Ronald) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Howard C. Nielson, Jr.. Plaintiff Patricia Reyes is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (tlh) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLSON & ASSOCIATES OF NW FLORIDA INC is a litigant

Latest cases where N.A.R. INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ronald Ady