This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2022 at 08:32:20 (UTC).

Reyes v. General US Construction, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 Reyes filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against General US Construction, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory A. Presnell and Leslie Hoffman Price. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00418

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory A. Presnell

Referral Judge

Leslie Hoffman Price

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARVIN REYES

Defendant

GENERAL US CONSTRUCTION, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew W. Birk

Attorney at Matthew Birk, Esq., Law Office

309 Ne 1St St.

Gainesville, FL 32601

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against General US Construction, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19273586) filed by Marvin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 2/25/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

1 #1

Proposed Summons

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued as to General US Construction, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#4

(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/28/2022. (DS) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Marvin Reyes. Related case(s): No (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Marvin Reyes. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN of service executed on March 3, 2022 by Marvin Reyes as to General US Construction, LLC. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Clerk's Default against General US Construction, LLC by Marvin Reyes. (Birk, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (Entered: 04/21/2022)

#9

(#9) Amended MOTION for Clerk's Default against General US Construction, LLC by Marvin Reyes. (Birk, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (Entered: 04/22/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Amended MOTION for Clerk's Default against General US Construction, LLC by Marvin Reyes. (Birk, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Clerk's Default against General US Construction, LLC by Marvin Reyes. (Birk, Matthew) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN of service executed on March 3, 2022 by Marvin Reyes as to General US Construction, LLC. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #4 Order by Marvin Reyes. (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Marvin Reyes. Related case(s): No (Birk, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Gregory A. Presnell on 2/28/2022. (DS) (Entered: 02/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to General US Construction, LLC. (BD) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Gregory A. Presnell and Magistrate Judge Leslie Hoffman Price. New case number: 6:22-cv-418-GAP-LHP. (LRB) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against General US Construction, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402 receipt number AFLMDC-19273586) filed by Marvin Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Birk, Matthew) Modified on 2/25/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew William Kumin