This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/07/2022 at 07:37:50 (UTC).

Gonzalez Reyes et al v. Condux International, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2021 Gonzalez Reyes filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Condux International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul W. Grimm. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-02873

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul W. Grimm

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DEYSI N. GONZALEZ REYES

TAMI L. RADOV

Marta Del Carmen Fraile

Defendants

CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC.

TELTEK SALES, INC.

Colonial Electric Supply Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nelson Ivan Burgos

Defendant Attorney

Nimalan Amirthalingam

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number CAL21-09838. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9596084), filed by CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE by CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice to Adverse Parties (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#6

(#6) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/10/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#7

(#7) Consent MOTION to Dismiss DUPLICATE FILING AND REIMBURSEMENT OF FILING FEE by Condux International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

7 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION to Dismiss DUPLICATE FILING AND REIMBURSEMENT OF FILING FEE; directing Court to reimburse Defendant $402. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/12/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Consent MOTION to Dismiss DUPLICATE FILING AND REIMBURSEMENT OF FILING FEE; directing Court to reimburse Defendant $402. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/12/2021. (ybs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent MOTION to Dismiss DUPLICATE FILING AND REIMBURSEMENT OF FILING FEE by Condux International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) LETTER ORDER Regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 11/10/2021. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's Notice of Standing Order concerning removal actions filed in this Court, which can be downloaded #here. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketTHE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR PRINCE GEORGE'S COUNTY, MARYLAND. (dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) UNREDACTED STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Colonial Electric Supply Company, Condux International, Inc., Teltek Sales, Inc., filed by Tami L. Radov, Deysi N. Gonzalez Reyes, Marta Del Carmen Fraile.(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan no longer assigned to the case. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC. re #1 Notice of Removal Notice to Adverse Parties (Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Nimalan Amirthalingam on behalf of CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Prince George's County Circuit Court, case number CAL21-09838. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0416-9596084), filed by CONDUX INTERNATIONAL, INC..(Amirthalingam, Nimalan) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less