This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/12/2021 at 08:28:18 (UTC).

Reyes v. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama et al

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Reyes filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is R David Proctor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01235

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R David Proctor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mishanta Reyes

Defendants

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Alabama

Anthem Inc

Health Care Service Corporation

Cambia Health Solutions Inc

CareFirst Inc

Premera Blue Cross

Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona Inc

USAble Mutual Insurance Company doing business as Arkansas Blue Cross and Blue Shield

Blue Cross of California doing business as Anthem Blue Cross

California Physicians Service Inc doing business as Blue Shield of California

Rocky Mountain Hospital & Medical Service Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Colorado

Anthem Health Plans Inc doing business as Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Connecticut

Highmark Inc

Highmark BCBSD Inc. doing business as Highmark Blue Cross Blue Shield Delaware

Group Hospitalization and Medical Services Inc doing business as CareFirst BlueCross BlueShield

Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Florida Inc

Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia Inc

Hawaii Medical Service Association doing business as Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Hawaii

51 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Deborah J Winegard

Attorney at WHATLEY KALLAS LLC

1068 Virginia Avenue Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306

Edith M Kallas

Attorney at WHATLEY KALLAS LLP

152 West 57Th Street41St Floor

New York, NY 10019

Edward K Wood, Jr

Attorney at WOOD LAW FIRM LLC

Po Box 382434

Birmingham, AL 35238

Henry C Quillen

Attorney at WHATLEY KALLAS LLP

159 Middle Street Suite 2D

Portsmouth, NH 03801

Joe R Whatley, Jr

Attorney at WHATLEY KALLAS LLP

2001 Park Place North Suite 1000

Birmingham, AL 35203

Patrick J Sheehan

Attorney at Whatley Kallas LLP

101 Federal Street, 19Th Floor

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#55

(#55) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#54

(#54) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Empire HealthChoice Assurance Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#53

(#53) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#52

(#52) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross of California waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#51

(#51) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#50

(#50) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Health Plans of Virginia Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#49

(#49) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Community Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#48

(#48) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nevada waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#47

(#47) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Inc waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City Inc waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona Inc waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York Inc waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Inc waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

#1

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Premera Blue Cross Blue Shield of Alaska waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Empire HealthChoice Assurance Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Georgia Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross of California waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Wisconsin waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Health Plans of Virginia Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Community Insurance Company waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Nevada waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Health Plans of New Hampshire Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Health Plans of Maine Inc waiver sent on 11/9/2021, answer due 1/8/2022. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Nebraska waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Michigan waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Louisiana Health Service & Indemnity Company waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Kansas Inc waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Kansas City Inc waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Blue Cross Blue Shield of Arizona Inc waiver sent on 10/29/2021, answer due 12/28/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York Inc waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mishanta Reyes. Anthem Inc waiver sent on 10/12/2021, answer due 12/11/2021. (Brown, W) (Entered: 11/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3924137. related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mishanta Reyes.(KAM). (Whatley, Joe) NDAL rec #B4601115752 Modified on 9/14/2021 (KAM). (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Mishanta Reyes.(KAM) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Highmark BCBSD, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Cambia Health Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where USAble Mutual Insurance Co is a litigant

Latest cases where HIGHMARK INC is a litigant