This case was last updated from PACER on 03/08/2021 at 09:11:44 (UTC).

Reyes-Soriano v. Goldsmith & Hull, PC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2021 Reyes-Soriano filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Goldsmith Hull, PC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kendall J. Newman and John A. Mendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00034

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    California Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kendall J. Newman

Presiding Judge

John A. Mendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Blossom Reyes-Soriano

Defendant

Goldsmith & Hull, PC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph Angelo

Attorney at Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.

1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Suite 250

Roseville, CA 95747

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Goldsmith & Hull, PC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

3 #3

VDRP

3 #2

Order re Filing Requirements

3 #1

Consent Form

#3

(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Goldsmith & Hull, PC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Angelo* *Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.* *1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Suite 250* *Roseville, CA 95747*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Goldsmith & Hull, PC by Blossom Reyes-Soriano. Attorney Angelo, Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9344141) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Goldsmith & Hull, PC served on 1/12/2021, answer due 2/2/2021. (Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Goldsmith & Hull, PC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph Angelo* *Gale Angelo Johnson & Pruett, P.C.* *1430 Blue Oaks Blvd., Suite 250* *Roseville, CA 95747*. (Benson, A.) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Goldsmith & Hull, PC by Blossom Reyes-Soriano. Attorney Angelo, Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9344141) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelo, Joseph) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Goldsmith & Hull, APC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph Angelo