This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2021 at 08:13:25 (UTC).

Reyes-Espinoza v. Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana County et al

Case Summary

On 05/14/2021 Reyes-Espinoza filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jerry H. Ritter and Martha Vazquez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00457

  • Filing Date:

    05/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jerry H. Ritter

Presiding Judge

Martha Vazquez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza

Defendants

Jack Gonzales

Chris Barela

Julio Barragan

Jessica Lujan

Arturo Perea

Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana County

Enrique Perez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joseph P. Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Kennedy & Ives, LLC

1000 2Nd Street, N.W.

Albuquerque, NM 87102

Defendant Attorneys

Haley R. Grant

Attorney at Mynatt Martinez Springer P.C.

Post Office Box 2699

Las Cruces, NM 88004-2699

Damian L Martinez

Attorney at Mynatt Martinez Springer P.C.

P.O. Box 2699

Las Cruces, NM 88004-2699

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza re #3 MOTION to Dismiss of Agreed Upon Extension for Plaintiff's Response (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Agreed Upon Extension (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE by Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Agreed Upon Extension (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Chris Barela, Julio Barragan, Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana County, Jack Gonzales, Jessica Lujan, Arturo Perea, Enrique Perez. (Martinez, Damian) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza re #3 MOTION to Dismiss of Agreed Upon Extension for Plaintiff's Response (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Agreed Upon Extension (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Oscar Omar Reyes-Espinoza re #3 MOTION to Dismiss Agreed Upon Extension (Kennedy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss by Chris Barela, Julio Barragan, Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana County, Jack Gonzales, Jessica Lujan, Arturo Perea, Enrique Perez. (Martinez, Damian) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Chris Barela, Julio Barragan, Board of County Commissioners of Dona Ana County, Jack Gonzales, Jessica Lujan, Arturo Perea, Enrique Perez re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Supplement Exhibit H (Attachments: #1 Supplement Notice of Removal filed in State Court) (Martinez, Damian) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filing fee: $ 402.00, receipt number ANMDC-7693200 re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Judicial District Court County of Dona Ana, case number D-307-CV-2021000818. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit)(Martinez, Damian) filed by Jessica Lujan, Julio Barragan, Chris Barela, Arturo Perea, Enrique Perez, Jack Gonzales (cmm)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketUnited States District Judge Martha Vazquez and United States Magistrate Judge Jerry H. Ritter assigned. (jg) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Third Judicial District Court County of Dona Ana, case number D-307-CV-2021000818. ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Martinez, Damian) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph P. Kennedy