This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/13/2020 at 10:55:49 (UTC).

Reyes-Colon v. Banco Popular de Puerto Rico et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Reyes-Colon filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against Banco Popular de Puerto Rico. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01417

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Courthouse:

    Puerto Rico District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Appellants

Edgar A Reyes Colon

Edgar A. Reyes-Colon

Appellees

Banco Popular de Puerto Rico

Popular Auto

Interested Party

US Trustee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant Attorney

Jose A. Pagan-Nieves

Attorney at PMB 305 1357 Ashford Av.

Appellee Attorneys

Sergio A. Ramirez-De-Arellano

Attorney at Sergio A. Ramirez de Arrellano Law Office

Banco Popular Center Suite 1022, 209 Munoz Rivera Ave.

San Juan, PR 00918-1009

Eldia M. Diaz-Olmo

Attorney at Eldia M. Diaz Olmo Law Office

304 Ponce De Leon Ave., Suite 1100

San Juan, PR 00918

Sergio Criado-Mangual

Attorney at Correa Acevedo & Abesada Law Office

#90 Carr. 165, Suite 407

Guaynabo, PR 00968

Roberto Abesada-Aguet

Attorney at Correa Acevedo & Abesada Law Offices, PSC

#90 Carr. 165 Suite 407

Guaynabo, PR 00968-8064

Gerardo Pavia

Attorney at Pavia & Lazaro PSC

Po Box 9746

San Juan, PR 00908

Interested Party Attorney

Monsita Lecaroz-Arribas

Attorney at U. S. Trustee Office

Ochoa Bldg. Suite 301, 500 Tanca St.

San Juan, PR 00901-1922

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ***STRICKEN AS PER D.E 8 ORDER*** MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2020 to file Appellants Initial BriefAND CLARIFICATION REQUEST filed by Jose A. Pagan-Nieves on behalf of Edgar A. Reyes-Colon Responses due by 10/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Nieves, Jose) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mg). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

#3

(#3) MOTION to transfer case to Case 20-01355 filed by Jose A. Pagan-Nieves on behalf of Edgar A. Reyes-Colon Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Nieves, Jose) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

1 #7

Certified Docket_Part4

1 #6

Certified Docket_Part3

1 #5

Certified Docket_Part2

1 #4

Certified Docket_Part1

1 #3

Order dkt 868

1 #2

Order dkt 863

1 #1

Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC

#1

(#1) TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Edgar A Reyes Colon. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 863, #3 Order dkt 868, #4 Certified Docket_Part1, #5 Certified Docket_Part2, #6 Certified Docket_Part3, #7 Certified Docket_Part4)(babk) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER striking #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Parties shall only make filings in the docket of the lead case: Civ. No. 20-1355 (JAG). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 10/5/2020. (ERC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ***STRICKEN AS PER D.E 8 ORDER*** MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2020 to file Appellants Initial BriefAND CLARIFICATION REQUEST filed by Jose A. Pagan-Nieves on behalf of Edgar A. Reyes-Colon Responses due by 10/13/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Nieves, Jose) Modified on 10/6/2020 (mg). (Entered: 09/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#6) Copy of ORDER granting 9 Motion to transfer case. This case (Civ. No. 20-1355 JAG) is hereby consolidated with Civ. No. 20-1417 PAD with Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez's consent. Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/27/2020. (ERC) (Entered: 08/27/2020). Signed by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory on 8/27/2020.(mg) (Entered: 08/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM OF THE CLERK: Pursuant to the Order entered by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 08/26/2020 (Docket No. 4) and the Order entered by Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory in Civil Case 20-1355 (see, Docket No. 10), this case has been consolidated with Civil Case 20-1355 (JAG) and thus transferred to the docket of Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. Signed by Clerk on 08/27/2020. (ft) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Granting #3 "Appellant's Notice of Related Matters and Motion to Transfer Related Matter." The case is transferred to the docket of judge Garcia-Gregory, who has consented to the transfer. Signed by Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez on 8/26/2020. (MPL) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to transfer case to Case 20-01355 filed by Jose A. Pagan-Nieves on behalf of Edgar A. Reyes-Colon Responses due by 9/8/2020. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Pagan-Nieves, Jose) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Pedro A. Delgado-Hernandez (arg) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) TRANSMITTAL of Notice of Appeal from Bankruptcy Court, filed by Edgar A Reyes Colon. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Appeal and Election to USDC, #2 Order dkt 863, #3 Order dkt 868, #4 Certified Docket_Part1, #5 Certified Docket_Part2, #6 Certified Docket_Part3, #7 Certified Docket_Part4)(babk) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Popular Auto LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Trustee is a litigant