This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/08/2021 at 10:18:13 (UTC).

REX - Real Estate Exchange Inc v. Zillow Inc et al

Case Summary

On 03/09/2021 REX - Real Estate Exchange Inc filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Zillow Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Zilly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-00312

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Zilly

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.

REX - Real Estate Exchange Inc

Defendants

Zillow, Inc.

Trulia, LLC

Zillow Group, Inc.

Zillow Group Marketplace, Inc.

The National Association of Realtors

Zillow Homes, Inc.

Zillow Listing Services, Inc.

Zillow Group Marketplace Inc

Zillow Listing Services Inc

Zillow Inc

Trulia LLC

Zillow Homes Inc

Zillow Group Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rylan L. S. Weythman

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC (SEA)

1111 3Rd Avenue, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101-3299

Michael K Vaska

Attorney at FOSTER GARVEY PC (SEA)

1111 3Rd Avenue, Ste 3000

Seattle, WA 98101-3299

Cristina Moreno

Attorney at MCCARTY LAW PLLC

1410B W 51St Street

Austin, TX 78756

Darren McCarty

Attorney at MCCARTY LAW PLLC

1410B W 51St Street

Austin, TX 78756

Defendant Attorneys

Michael Bonanno

Attorney at QUINN EMANUELL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP

1300 I Street Nw Ste 9000

Washington, DC 20005

Ethan Glass

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP (DC)

1300 I Street Nw Ste 900

Washington, DC 20005

Thomas C Rubin

Attorney at QUINN EMANUEL URQUHART & SULLIVAN LLP (WA)

1109 First Ave, Ste 210

Seattle, WA 98101

Aravind Swaminathan

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP (SEA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Ste 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

John A Jurata, Jr

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE (DC)

1152 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Russell P Cohen

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE (SF)

405 Howard St, 7Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Naomi J Scotten

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE (NY)

51 W 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Nicole M. Tadano

Attorney at ORRICK HERRINGTON & SUTCLIFFE LLP (SEA)

701 Fifth Avenue, Ste 5600

Seattle, WA 98104

 

Court Documents

68 #1

Proposed Order

#68

#67

66 #41

Exhibit 41

66 #40

Exhibit 40

66 #36

Exhibit 36

66 #27

Exhibit 27

66 #16

Exhibit 16

66 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #8

Summons The National Association of Realtors

1 #7

Summons Trulia, LLC

1 #6

Summons Zillow Group Marketplace, Inc.

1 #5

Summons Zillow Listing Services, Inc.

1 #4

Summons Zillow Homes, Inc.

1 #3

Summons Zillow Group, Inc.

1 #2

Summons Zillow, Inc.

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

121 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPlaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange Inc.'s unopposed motion, docket no. #68 , to file an overlength, consolidated reply is GRANTED, and Plaintiff's consolidated reply shall not exceed twenty (20) pages. (SRS) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) MOTION for Leave TO FILE OVER-LENGTH, CONSOLIDATED REPLY IN SUPPORT OF ITS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/4/2021, (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 05/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by The National Association of Realtors (Rubin, Thomas) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) DECLARATION of Ethan Glass ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant The National Association of Realtors re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45)(Rubin, Thomas) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) DECLARATION of Rene Galicia ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendant The National Association of Realtors re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Rubin, Thomas) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) RESPONSE, by Defendant The National Association of Realtors, to #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Oral Argument Requested. (Rubin, Thomas) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Glenn Hubbard ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Trulia LLC, Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Homes Inc, Zillow Inc, Zillow Listing Services Inc re #58 MOTION to Seal , #56 Declaration, (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Matt Hendricks ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Trulia LLC, Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Homes Inc, Zillow Inc, Zillow Listing Services Inc re #58 MOTION to Seal , #54 Declaration, (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) SEALED DOCUMENT Declaration of Errol Samuelson ISO Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Trulia LLC, Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Homes Inc, Zillow Inc, Zillow Listing Services Inc re #58 MOTION to Seal , #53 Declaration, (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) SEALED DOCUMENT Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendants Trulia LLC, Zillow Group Inc, Zillow Homes Inc, Zillow Inc, Zillow Listing Services Inc re #58 MOTION to Seal , #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , #52 Response to Motion (Swaminathan, Aravind) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DECLARATION of Philip Van Ham filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DECLARATION of Josephine Maggio filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DECLARATION of Jack Ryan filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DECLARATION of Craig Barrett filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DECLARATION of Brandy Lawrence filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , filed by Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.. Oral Argument Requested. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 5/10/2021 4/2/2021, (Weythman, Rylan) Modified on 3/30/2021 (MW). (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Darren L. McCarty FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6991054 (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Cristina M. Moreno FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-6991048 (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc. (Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Injunctive Relief And For Damages against defendant(s) The National Association of Realtors, Trulia, LLC, Zillow Group Marketplace, Inc., Zillow Group, Inc., Zillow Homes, Inc., Zillow Listing Services, Inc., Zillow, Inc. with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # AWAWDC-6990999), filed by REX - Real Estate Exchange, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Zillow, Inc., #3 Summons Zillow Group, Inc., #4 Summons Zillow Homes, Inc., #5 Summons Zillow Listing Services, Inc., #6 Summons Zillow Group Marketplace, Inc., #7 Summons Trulia, LLC, #8 Summons The National Association of Realtors)(Weythman, Rylan) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRULIA INC, is a litigant

Latest cases where REX - REAL ESTATE EXCHANGE, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Zillow Group Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The National Association of Realtors is a litigant