This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/23/2019 at 07:42:33 (UTC).

Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC v. Delgado-Baez et al

Case Summary

On 02/22/2019 Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Delgado-Baez. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Gustavo A. Gelpi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01179

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gustavo A. Gelpi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC

3900 Capital City Blvd

Lansing, MI 48906

Defendants

Pedro Alberto Delgado Baez

United States of America

Daisy Rodriguez Davila

Conjugal Partnership Delgado-Rodriguez

Daisy Rodriguez-Davila

Pedro Alberto Delgado-Baez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez

Attorney at GLS Legal Services

1216 Luchetti

San Juan, PR 00906

 

Court Documents

#8

7 #1

Summons

#7

6 #1

Summons

#6

#5

4 #5

6

4 #3

4

4 #2

3

4 #1

2

#4

3 #1

Summons

#3

1 #10

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC upon United States of America served on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed for Conjugal Partnership by Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC upon Conjugal Partnership Delgado-Rodriguez served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed for Daisy Rodriguez by Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC upon Daisy Rodriguez-Davila served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed of Pedro Delgado by Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC upon Pedro Alberto Delgado-Baez served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019. (Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) (Entered: 04/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDERS: (1) DISCOVERY DISPUTES, (2) COURTESY COPIES, (3) DEPOSITIONS IN CIVIL CASES, (4) CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE, (5) COMMUNICATIONS BY COUNSEL OR THEIR STAFF WITH JUDGE GELPI'S CHAMBERS' STAFF, (6) CODE OF CIVILITY. (gmm) (Entered: 03/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Conjugal Partnership Delgado-Rodriguez, Pedro Alberto Delgado-Baez, Daisy Rodriguez-Davila, United States of America (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • (#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Gustavo A. Gelpi (arg) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-6291593.), filed by Reverse Mortgage Funding, LLC. Service due by 5/29/2019, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Civil Cover Sheet, #11 Category Sheet)(Hernandez-Hernandez, Valerie) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REVERSE MORTGAGE FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Valerie N. Hernandez-Hernandez