This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:35:34 (UTC).

Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini v. Riverside County Sherriffs Dept et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Reverend Benjamin M Caranchini filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Riverside County Sherriffs Dept. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02342

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini

Chino, CA 91708

Defendants

Riverside County Sherriffs Dept

Redman

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME #7 ; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL #5 ; AND DISMISSING MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT ELECTRONIC FILING #5 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#5

(#5) MOTION to Proceed Without Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

4 #2

Voluntary Dismissal Form

#9

(#9) AMENDED REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#2

(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. filed against Defedant Riverside County Sherriffs Dept, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION to Postpone Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. For these reasons, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before January 17, 2020 why his in forma pauperis application should not be denied and his complaint accordingly dismissed. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must first file a complete form CV-60P (attached here) that includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the last six months. Even then, Plaintiff must also file either an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies described in this order or a response to this order explaining why it is wrong. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a notice of voluntary dismissal using the attached form CV-09 if he cannot cure the deficiencies outlined in this order. In any case, failure to file a voluntary dismissal, an amended complaint, or a timely response to this order may result in involuntary dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) L.R. 41-1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 IFP Request Form, #2 Voluntary Dismissal Form) (clee) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

4 #1

IFP Request Form

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address to California Institution for Men, Cedar Hall 104L, P.O. Box 600, Chino, CA 91708. Filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini.(hr) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#10

(#10) IN FORMA PAUPERIS FINANCIAL CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) In light of the Notice of Change of Address #11 , the Order Granting Extension of Time; Denying Motion for Appointment of Counsel; and Dismissing Motion to Proceed Without Electronic Filing #8 was re-mailed to Plaintiff at California Institution for Men Cedar Hall 104L PO Box 600 Chino, CA 91708. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (clee) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Change of Address to California Institution for Men, Cedar Hall 104L, P.O. Box 600, Chino, CA 91708. Filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini.(hr) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) IN FORMA PAUPERIS FINANCIAL CERTIFICATION filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME #7 ; DENYING MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL #5 ; AND DISMISSING MOTION TO PROCEED WITHOUT ELECTRONIC FILING #5 by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (clee) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Postpone Order to Show Cause filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Appointment of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Proceed Without Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (hr) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. For these reasons, Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE on or before January 17, 2020 why his in forma pauperis application should not be denied and his complaint accordingly dismissed. If Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this action, he must first file a complete form CV-60P (attached here) that includes a certified copy of his trust account statement for the last six months. Even then, Plaintiff must also file either an amended complaint that cures the deficiencies described in this order or a response to this order explaining why it is wrong. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file a notice of voluntary dismissal using the attached form CV-09 if he cannot cure the deficiencies outlined in this order. In any case, failure to file a voluntary dismissal, an amended complaint, or a timely response to this order may result in involuntary dismissal of this action for failure to prosecute. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) L.R. 41-1. IT IS SO ORDERED. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Attachments: #1 IFP Request Form, #2 Voluntary Dismissal Form) (clee) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Reverend Benjamin M. Caranchini. filed against Defedant Riverside County Sherriffs Dept, pursuant to 42 USC 1983. Case assigned to Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (jtil) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.