This case was last updated from PACER on 12/21/2020 at 07:18:40 (UTC).

Revenue Properties (America) Inc v. ABC Moving Systems Incorporated

Case Summary

On 10/22/2020 Revenue Properties America Inc filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ABC Moving Systems Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John Robert Blakey. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06273

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John Robert Blakey

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Revenue Properties (America) Inc

Defendant

ABC Moving Systems Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert James Spinazzola

Attorney at Maisel & Associates

161 N. Clark Street, Suite 800

Chicago, IL 60601-1014

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Revenue Properties (America) Inc as to ABC Moving Systems Incorporated on 12/5/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#7

(#7) STATUS Report Plaintiff's Initial Status Report by Revenue Properties (America) Inc (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Revenue Properties (America) Inc Notice of Fiing Affidavit of Service (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#5

(#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Idar Moyal, RA on 12/5/2020, filed by Plaintiff Revenue Properties (America) Inc. (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 12/14/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Revenue Properties (America) Inc by Robert James Spinazzola (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Revenue Properties (America) Inc; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17568569.(Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Revenue Properties (America) Inc as to ABC Moving Systems Incorporated on 12/5/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS Report Plaintiff's Initial Status Report by Revenue Properties (America) Inc (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Revenue Properties (America) Inc Notice of Fiing Affidavit of Service (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT of Service of Summons and Complaint served on Idar Moyal, RA on 12/5/2020, filed by Plaintiff Revenue Properties (America) Inc. (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant ABC Moving Systems Incorporated (mp, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable John Robert Blakey: This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable John Robert Blakey. The litigants are ordered to review and fully comply with all of this Court's standing orders, which are available on Judge Blakey's information page on the Court's official website: http://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. In addition, the parties must file a status report no later than 12/14/2020, using the model template set forth in this Court's standing order regarding Initial (or Reassignment) Status Conferences. Failure by any party to file the status report by the requisite deadline (either jointly or, if necessary, individually with an explanation as to why a joint report could not be filed) may result in a summary dismissal of the case for failure to prosecute, or an entry of default against any served defendant(s) failing to comply with this order. During the litigation, the attorneys must also appear at all hearing dates set by the Court or noticed by the parties. If an attorney has a conflict with a set court date, the attorney must notify Judge Blakey's Courtroom Deputy, Gloria Lewis, at (312) 818-6699. If appropriate, the Court will then reset the matter. Advising opposing counsel of a scheduling conflict is not a substitute for communicating directly with the Court. Mailed notice (gel, ) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable John Robert Blakey. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey T. Gilbert. Case assignment: Random assignment. (dxb, ) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Revenue Properties (America) Inc by Robert James Spinazzola (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Revenue Properties (America) Inc; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17568569.(Spinazzola, Robert) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less