This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/08/2020 at 08:44:13 (UTC).

Revell v. American Medical Systems, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/09/2020 Revell filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against American Medical Systems, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew J. Kacsmaryk and Lee Ann Reno. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00232

  • Filing Date:

    10/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew J. Kacsmaryk

Referral Judge

Lee Ann Reno

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cathy Revell

Defendants

American Medical Systems, LLC, individually

American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc

Endo Health Solutions Inc

Astora Women's Health, LLC

Endo Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc

Endo Phamaceuticals, Inc.

American Medical Systems, Inc.

American Medical systems Holdings, Inc.

Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC

American Medical Systems, LLC

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc

American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. and

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Spencer P Browne

Attorney at Reyes Browne Reilley

8222 Douglas Avenue, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75225

Ryan J Browne

Attorney at Angel L Reyes & Associates PC

8222 Douglas Avenue, Suite 400

Dallas, TX 75225

Defendant Attorney

Christina M Vitale

Attorney at Reed Smith LLP

811 Main Street, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#31

#30

#29

#28

26 #3

Exhibit(s) C

26 #2

Exhibit(s) B

26 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#26

#23

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit(s) Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit(s) Disclosures

1 #1

Exhibit(s) Notice of Removal

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) ORDER ADOPTING THE PROTOCOLS FROM THE IN RE: AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS, INC. PELVIC REPAIR SYSTEMS PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION, MDL NO. 2325 (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/4/2020) (daa) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER REGARDING POTENTIAL DISCOVERY DISPUTES (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/4/2020) (daa) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall be ready for trial on or before May 31, 2022. This is not a trial setting. Joinder of Parties due by 12/15/2020. Deadline for mediation is on or before 5/31/2021. Pretrial Materials (expert witnesses) due by 08/16/2021 for parties seeking affirmative relief and due by 09/15/2021 for parties opposing affirmative relief. Amended Pleadings due by 9/30/2021. Discovery due by 11/19/2021. Motions Not Otherwise Covered due by 12/17/2021. The parties must file Rule 26(a)(3) disclosures on or before April 29, 2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 12/4/2020) (daa) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER TERMINATING DEFENDANTS AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS HOLDINGS, INC., ASTORA WOMEN'S HEAL TH HOLDINGS, LLC, ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS HOLDINGS INC., AND ENDO HEALTH SOLUTIONS INC: Party Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. and Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC terminated. (Ordered by Judge Matthew J. Kacsmaryk on 12/3/2020) (nhp) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • Docket(#27) ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held via video teleconference on 12/2/2020. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Ryan J Browne; Defense - Christina M Vitale. (Court Reporter: Digital File) (No exhibits) Time in Court - 1:16. (chmb) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C) (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER denying as moot #23 Plaintiff Cathy Revell's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 11/20/2020) (daa) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #22 Defendants American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, and Astora Women's Health, LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Time to Appoint Local Counsel. Defendants American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, and Astora Women's Health, LLC shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel on or before December 10, 2020. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lee Ann Reno on 11/20/2020) (daa) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel filed by Cathy Revell (Browne, Ryan) Modified title on 11/20/2020 (daa). (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time To Appoint Local Counsel filed by American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Supplemental Document by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Astora Women's Health, LLC, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. as to #1 Notice of Removal,,,,, Supplemetal Cover Sheet. (Vitale, Christina) (Main Document 10 replaced with flattened document on 10/19/2020) (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., Astora Women's Heath Holdings, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration(s) of Deanna Voss, #2 Exhibit(s) 1 - Agmt of Merger, #3 Exhibit(s) 2 - USSEC Form 8-K, #4 Exhibit(s) 3 - 10 Q, #5 Exhibit(s) 4 - Press Release) (Vitale, Christina) Modified filer on 10/19/2020 (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Vitale, Christina) Modified filers on 10/19/2020 (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Vitale, Christina) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 10/19/2020) (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Endo International plc for Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc. (Vitale, Christina) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 10/19/2020) (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Endo Health Solutions Inc identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions Inc. (Vitale, Christina) (Main Document 5 replaced with flattened document on 10/19/2020) (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Endo International plc for Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC. (Vitale, Christina) (Main Document 4 replaced with flattened document on 10/19/2020) (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Endo International plc for American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.. (Vitale, Christina) (Main Document 3 replaced with flattened document on 10/19/2020) (awc). (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by American Medical Systems, Inc.. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Vitale, Christina) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by Astora Women's Health, LLC, Astora Women's Health Holdings, LLC, Endo Pharmaceutical Holdings Inc, American Medical Systems, LLC, individually, Endo Phamaceuticals, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc, American Medical systems Holdings, Inc.. (Filing Fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11275490 -- See Doc #11.) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit(s) Disclosures, #3 Exhibit(s) Complaint) (Vitale, Christina) Modified filing fee information on 10/19/2020 (awc). (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Astora Women's Health is a litigant

Latest cases where AMERICAN MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant