This case was last updated from PACER on 12/17/2019 at 08:26:36 (UTC).

Rettelle v. Michigan, State of et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2019 Rettelle filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Michigan, State of. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00858

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Justina Rettelle

Lansing, MI 48933

Defendants

Gretchen Whitmer

Michigan, State of

Lansing Police Department

Michigan Department of Attorney General

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#6

(#6) OBJECTION by plaintiff Justina Rettelle to Report and Recommendation #5 (clw) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lansing Police Department, Michigan Department of Attorney General, Michigan, State of, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Justina Rettelle (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#2

(#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#5

(#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

#7

(#7) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Certified Copy of Judgment #8 , Order Regarding Report and Recommendation #7 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (clw) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) JUDGMENT; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION #5 ; signed by District Judge Paul L. Maloney (Judge Paul L. Maloney, cmc) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) OBJECTION by plaintiff Justina Rettelle to Report and Recommendation #5 (clw) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Report and Recommendation #5 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (clw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 ; objections to R&R due within 14 days; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 10/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #4 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (clw) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER granting plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (jkw) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Receipt of Case Notice #3 sent via U.S. Mail to Justina Rettelle (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of receipt of case (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) APPLICATION TO PROCEED without prepayment of fees and affidavit (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against Lansing Police Department, Michigan Department of Attorney General, Michigan, State of, Gretchen Whitmer filed by Justina Rettelle (jlb) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.