This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/17/2020 at 10:06:08 (UTC).

Resorts Group, Inc. v. Cerberus Capital Management, L.P. et al

Case Summary

On 05/18/2020 Resorts Group, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Cerberus Capital Management, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lewis J. Liman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03863

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lewis J. Liman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Resorts Group, Inc.

Defendants

CRE Bushkill Group, LLC

CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC

CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC

Cerberus Capital Management, L.P.

Club Exploria, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David S. Rosner

Defendant Attorneys

David Andrew Crichlow, Sr

Brian Lee Muldrew

 

Court Documents

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit E: Second Supplemental Agreement

1 #4

Exhibit D: PSQ Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C: Supplemental Agreement.

1 #2

Exhibit B: Participation Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A: Servicing Agreement

#1

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

06/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#22) ORDER granting #21 Letter Motion for Extension of Time (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Lewis J. Liman)(Text Only Order) (MM) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#21) FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Move, Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint, addressed to Judge Lewis J. Liman from David A. Crichlow dated 6/1/20. Document filed by CRE Bushkill Group, LLC, CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC, CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC, Club Exploria, LLC..(Crichlow, David) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#20) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David Andrew Crichlow, Sr on behalf of CRE Bushkill Group, LLC, CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC, CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC, Club Exploria, LLC..(Crichlow, David) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/01/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Lee Muldrew on behalf of CRE Bushkill Group, LLC, CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC, CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC, Club Exploria, LLC..(Muldrew, Brian) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#18) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#17) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CRE Bushkill Group, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#15) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Club Exploria, LLC..(jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Cerberus Capital Management, L.P...(jgo) (Entered: 05/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#13) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Club Exploria, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
05/19/2020

DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pne) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2020

DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lewis J. Liman. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pne) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#8) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Club Exploria, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) Modified on 5/19/2020 (pne). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/19/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) Modified on 5/19/2020 (pne). (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CRE Bushkill Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Cerberus Capital Management, L.P., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc...(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/18/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CRE Bushkill Group, LLC, CRE Niagara Holdings, LLC, CRE Niagara Participation Holdings, LLC, Cerberus Capital Management, L.P., Club Exploria, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-19882182)Document filed by Resorts Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Servicing Agreement, #2 Exhibit B: Participation Agreement, #3 Exhibit C: Supplemental Agreement., #4 Exhibit D: PSQ Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Second Supplemental Agreement).(Rosner, David) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less