This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2021 at 09:27:16 (UTC).

Resonate Real Estate Holdings, LLC v. Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 Resonate Real Estate Holdings, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Benita Y. Pearson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00458

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Benita Y. Pearson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Resonate Real Estate Holdings, LLC

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff

Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC

3Rd Party Defendant

Michels Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Edmond J. Mack

Attorney at Plakas Mannos

200 Market Avenue North

Canton, OH 44702

Lauren A. Gribble

Attorney at Plakas Mannos

200 Market Avenue North

Canton, OH 44702

Defendant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorney

Jennifer A. Flint

Attorney at Bricker & Eckler

100 South Third Street

Columbus, OH 43215

3Rd Party Defendant Attorney

Julian T. Emerson

Attorney at Reminger Co. - Cleveland

1400 Midland Bldg., 101 Prospect Avenue, W

Cleveland, OH 44115

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

#6

#8

#9

#10

#11

#13

#14

#15

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Michels Corporation. Michels Corporation waiver sent on 3/29/2021, answer due 5/28/2021 filed on behalf of Michels Corporation (Emerson, Julian) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Attorney Appearance by Julian T. Emerson filed by on behalf of Michels Corporation. (Emerson, Julian) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order The Third-Party Complaint (ECF No. #12 ) in this action was filed on 3/29/2021. The file in this case shows no summons has been provided or issued. If Third-Party Plaintiff's counsel does not receive a returned Waiver of the Service of Summons from Third-Party Defendant by 4/28/2021, she shall immediately file a Praecipe for Issuance of the original summons. The summons to be issued to Third-Party Defendant should be uploaded as an attachment to the Praecipe. See LR 4.2, if service of the summons will be made by certified mail. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 4/13/2021. (JLG) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Answer to Complaint and Third-Party Complaint Against Michels Corporation (Related Doc #1 ) filed by Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Third-Party Complaint - Construction Contract Excerpts, #2 Exhibit B to Third-Party Complaint - Demand Letter)(Flint, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Address Change Notice by Lauren A. Gribble filed by on behalf of Resonate Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Gribble, Lauren) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Acknowledgement of receipt of original state court record received on 3/11/21 from Stark County Court of Common Pleas.Related document(s) #7 . (M,TL) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Jurisdictional Statement filed by Resonate Real Estate Holdings, LLC. (Gribble, Lauren) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Jurisdictional Statement of Defendant filed by Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. (Flint, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) State court documents received from Stark County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2021cv00107. Original record returned to Stark County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Stark County Clerk of Courts) (O,K) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Order For the reasons set forth herein, on or before 3/12/2021, Plaintiff and Defendant shall each file and serve a Jurisdictional Statement identifying the citizenship of all members of Plaintiff and Defendant limited liability companies, as well as the partnerships in Defendant's corporate ownership structure. For good cause shown, the parties' Agreed Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. Defendant is given until 3/29/2021 to move or plead. This Court requires defendants to file an answer to the complaint regardless of whether they have filed or plan to file a motion to dismiss. The filing of a motion to dismiss shall not delay the time in which the party must answer an affirmative pleading. Before a defendant may file a dispositive motion in response to an affirmative pleading, it must submit a written request for judgment or to be dismissed to opposing counsel. Opposing counsel shall either agree to the judgment or request for dismissal or shall give explicit reasons in writing for refusing to do so. Upon such refusal, a defendant shall reassess its position and may file a dispositive motion if it believes it is still entitled to judgment on the pleadings or dismissal. The dispositive motion must be accompanied by a statement certifying that this exchange has occurred. Judge Benita Y. Pearson on 3/5/2021. (JLG) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Motion for extension of time until March 29, 2021 to answer Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order Granting Agreed Motion for Extension)(Flint, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketRandom Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen B. Burke. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketJudge Benita Y. Pearson assigned to case. (M,TL) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement, filed by Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Flint, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet filed by Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. Related document(s) #1 . (Flint, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal from Stark County Common Pleas, case number 2021 CV 00107 Filing fee paid $ 402, receipt number AOHNDC-10682376.. Filed by Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Stark County Complaint) (Flint, Jennifer) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Nexus Gas Transmission, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Michels Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julian T. Emerson