This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/26/2019 at 07:13:11 (UTC).

Ilene S. Resnick Weiss v. Audi of America, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 Ilene S Resnick Weiss filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Audi of America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Steve Kim. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05609

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner

Ilene S. Resnick Weiss

Petitioners

VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.,

Ilene S. Resnick Weiss

Audi of America, LLC

Defendants and Petitioners

Audi of America, LLC

Volkswagen Group of America

Does 1 through 20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorney

Daniel J Weiss

345 Avondale Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90049

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Conditional Transfer Order - 150 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#23

(#23) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #21 , #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-5609-CAS-SK, but should read CV 19-5609-CJC-SK. See Order Reassigning (Dkt. 14). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#22

(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rene Nordquist, Corporate Operations Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moran, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss, upon Defendant Audi of America, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management/Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moran, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

#20

(#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 as to Defendant Volkswagen Group of America. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#19

(#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 as to Defendant Audi of America, LLC. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

#17

(#17) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#15

(#15) [CORRECTED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Audi of America, LLC, Does, Volkswagen Group of America amending Amended Complaint/Petition #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss(Weiss, Daniel) Modified on 7/3/2019 (gga). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#15) [CORRECTED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Audi of America, LLC, Does, Volkswagen Group of America amending Amended Complaint/Petition #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss(Weiss, Daniel) Modified on 7/3/2019 (gga). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#8

(#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 , Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#5

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#4

(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss, identifying Audi AG; Volkswagen AG. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

#1

(#15) [CORRECTED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Audi of America, LLC, Does, Volkswagen Group of America amending Amended Complaint/Petition #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss(Weiss, Daniel) Modified on 7/3/2019 (gga). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) Conditional Transfer Order - 150 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2672, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of California and assigned to Honorable Charles R. Breyer. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service #21 , #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. Case number reads CV 19-5609-CAS-SK, but should read CV 19-5609-CJC-SK. See Order Reassigning (Dkt. 14). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (iv) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss, upon Defendant Volkswagen Group of America served on 8/6/2019, answer due 8/27/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rene Nordquist, Corporate Operations Specialist, Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moran, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss, upon Defendant Audi of America, LLC served on 8/5/2019, answer due 8/26/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lynanne Gares, Litigation Management/Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Moran, Matthew) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 as to Defendant Volkswagen Group of America. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition, #15 as to Defendant Audi of America, LLC. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First Amended Complaint #15 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #15 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) [CORRECTED] FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Audi of America, LLC, Does, Volkswagen Group of America amending Amended Complaint/Petition #9 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss(Weiss, Daniel) Modified on 7/3/2019 (gga). (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #8 , Amended Complaint/Petition #9 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Audi of America, LLC, Does, Volkswagen Group of America amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss(Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , Summons Request #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 06/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss, identifying Audi AG; Volkswagen AG. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23997225 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Ilene S. Resnick Weiss. (Attorney Daniel J Weiss added to party Ilene S. Resnick Weiss(pty:bkmov))(Weiss, Daniel) (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AUDI OF AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Volkswagen Group America, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J Weiss