This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/04/2021 at 09:28:49 (UTC).

Resin Corporation v. Stanko

Case Summary

On 02/03/2021 Resin Corporation filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Stanko. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark H. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00520

  • Filing Date:

    02/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark H. Cohen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Resin Corporation

Elevate Brands, LLC

Defendant

Brianna Stanko

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yasha Heidari

Attorney at Heidari Power Law Group LLC

2997 Cobb Parkway #724615

Atlanta, GA 31139

Defendant Attorneys

Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker -Atl

Suite 1400, 3348 Peachtree Road Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

Parks Kalervo Stone

Attorney at Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker -Atl

Suite 1400, 3348 Peachtree Road Ne

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

12 #6

Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Brianna Stanko

12 #5

Exhibit Exhibit C to Hitzke Declaration - California Judgment

12 #4

Exhibit Exhibit B to Hitzke Declaration - email notifying Resin of trial

12 #3

Exhibit Exhibit A to Hitzke Declaration - Resin request to intervene

12 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Daniel Hitzke

12 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Resin's Request for Intervention/Modification in Califo

#12

(#12) REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support filed by Brianna Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Resin's Request for Intervention/Modification in California Court and Order on same, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Daniel Hitzke, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hitzke Declaration - Resin request to intervene, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Hitzke Declaration - email notifying Resin of trial, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Hitzke Declaration - California Judgment, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Brianna Stanko)(Stone, Parks) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

#11

(#11) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

#10

(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support filed by Resin Corporation. (Heidari, Yasha) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3: Notice of Dismissal of District Court Case

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2: California District Court Show Cause Order

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1: California Superior Divorce Court Order

#9

(#9) MOTION For Judicial Notice of Certain California Case Documents by Brianna Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: California Superior Divorce Court Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: California District Court Show Cause Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Notice of Dismissal of District Court Case)(Stone, Parks) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

8 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3: Notice of Dismissal of District Court Case

8 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2: California District Court Show Cause Order

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1: California Superior Divorce Court Order

#8

(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support by Brianna Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: California Superior Divorce Court Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: California District Court Show Cause Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Notice of Dismissal of District Court Case)(Stone, Parks) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

#7

(#7) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 28, 2021; June 1, 17, 18, 2, 2021; July 2 and 6, 2021; September 3 and 7, 2021; October 7, 8, and 11, 2021; November 24, 26, and 29, 2021; December 23, 24, 27, 31, 2021; and January 3, 2022., by Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV. (Washburn, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPLY BRIEF re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support filed by Brianna Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Resin's Request for Intervention/Modification in California Court and Order on same, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Daniel Hitzke, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Hitzke Declaration - Resin request to intervene, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Hitzke Declaration - email notifying Resin of trial, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C to Hitzke Declaration - California Judgment, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Declaration of Brianna Stanko)(Stone, Parks) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #9 MOTION For Judicial Notice of Certain California Case Documents , to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ELEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 03/09/2021 (adg) (ADI) (Entered: 03/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support filed by Resin Corporation. (Heidari, Yasha) (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION For Judicial Notice of Certain California Case Documents by Brianna Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: California Superior Divorce Court Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: California District Court Show Cause Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Notice of Dismissal of District Court Case)(Stone, Parks) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Resin Corporation's Complaint and Memorandum In Support by Brianna Stanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1: California Superior Divorce Court Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2: California District Court Show Cause Order, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3: Notice of Dismissal of District Court Case)(Stone, Parks) (Entered: 02/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): May 28, 2021; June 1, 17, 18, 2, 2021; July 2 and 6, 2021; September 3 and 7, 2021; October 7, 8, and 11, 2021; November 24, 26, and 29, 2021; December 23, 24, 27, 31, 2021; and January 3, 2022., by Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV. (Washburn, Lawrence) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): March 1-9, 2021; June 21-30, 2021; and May 25- June 1, 2021., by Parks Kalervo Stone. (Stone, Parks) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER - The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to terminate the submission for the Request for Temporary Restraining Order (included in the Complaint) [Doc. #2 ]. In the event Plaintiff desires immediate injunctive relief, it must file an appropriate motion in accordance with the Local Rules and this Court's Standing Order. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/4/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Mark H. Cohen on 2/4/2021. (tcc) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 Notice of Removal and #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (jpa) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 01/27/2021. (jpa) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST for Temporary Restraining Order (included in Complaint) by Resin Corporation. (jpa) (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Brianna Stanko. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AGANDC-10687847) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(jpa) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 02/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Resin Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Parks Kalervo Stone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lawrence Lee Washburn, IV