This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2021 at 12:47:35 (UTC).

Residential Warranty Services v. Goyo Media et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2020 Residential Warranty Services filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Goyo Media. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Tena Campbell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00898

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Tena Campbell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Residential Warranty Services

Defendants

John Hard

Goyo Media

Clear Satellite

Clear Home

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Eric Babych

Alexandra R. French

Alexander P. Orlowski

Defendant Attorney

Cole S. Cannon

 

Court Documents

16 #2

Affidavit of Paul Southam

16 #1

Affidavit of John Hard

#16

#15

#14

RESTRICTED

#13

RESTRICTED

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order PHV Order

7 #1

Supplement PHV application

#7

6 #2

Text of Proposed Order PHV Order

6 #1

Supplement PHV application

#6

#5

#4

#3

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Defendants Clear Home, Clear Satellite, Goyo Media, John Hard. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of John Hard, #2 Affidavit of Paul Southam) Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Clear Home(pty:dft), Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Clear Satellite(pty:dft), Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party John Hard(pty:dft)(Cannon, Cole) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Goyo Media's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Goyo Media. Attorney Cole S. Cannon added to party Goyo Media(pty:dft)(Cannon, Cole) (Entered: 02/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to John Hard Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to Goyo Media Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to Clear Home Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ** RESTRICTED DOCUMENT ** WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Residential Warranty Services as to Clear Satellite Waiver sent on 1/4/2021, answer due 3/5/2021. (French, Alexandra) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen (14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexandra R. French for Residential Warranty Services.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) DOCKET TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Alexander P. Orlowski for Residential Warranty Services.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html. Instructions are available at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing.Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice may download a copy of the District of Utahs local rules from the courts web site at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/rules-practice. So ordered by Judge Tena Campbell on 12/30/20 (docket text only - no attached document) (alt) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexandra R. French , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3848120,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PHV application, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Order)(Babych, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) First MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Alexander P. Orlowski , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3848073,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services. (Attachments: #1 Supplement PHV application, #2 Text of Proposed Order PHV Order)(Babych, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Babych, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Babych on behalf of Residential Warranty Services (Babych, Eric) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Alexander P. Orlowski & Alexandra R. French, for Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services. (dw) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT Residential Warranty Services against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-3846812) filed by Residential Warranty Services. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Service and Marketing Agreement, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - RWS Demand Letter) Assigned to Judge Tena Campbell (Babych, Eric) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Judge Tena Campbell. Plaintiff Residential Warranty Services is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (dw) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less