Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:04:39 (UTC).

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Masood

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Republic Technologies NA , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Masood. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edmond E. Chang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08023

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edmond E. Chang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SREAM, INC.

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC

Defendants

MAMDOUH MASOOD

Mamdouh Masood doing business as Sunshine Food Mart

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher V. Langone

Attorney at Langone, Batson & Lavery LLC

17 N. Wabash, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

5 #1

Status Report Requirements

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 02/03/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#4

(#4) E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

2 #1

exhibits

#2

(#2) E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(las, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #6

Exhibit

1 #5

Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale

1 #4

Exhibit D; License Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C; License Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B: Republic Registration

1 #1

Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16508515. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Exhibit)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Edmond E. Chang: Initial status hearing set for 02/03/2020 at 9:00 a.m. The parties must file a joint initial status report with the content described in the attached status report requirements at least 3 business days before the initial status hearing. Plaintiff must still file the report even if not all Defendants have been served or have responded to requests to craft a joint report. Because the Procedures are occasionally revised, counsel must read them anew even if counsel has appeared before Judge Chang in other cases. Mailed notice (Attachments: #1 Status Report Requirements) (mw, ) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (las, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (las, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Edmond E. Chang. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) E-MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (Attachments: #1 exhibits)(las, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16508515. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Exhibit)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Republic Technologies (NA), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SREAM, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher V. Langone