This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:22:47 (UTC).

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Jam Food Market, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Republic Technologies NA , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Jam Food Market, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07993

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SREAM, INC.

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC

Defendants

MOHAMMAD MANSOUR

JAM FOOD MARKET, INC. d/b/a CONVENIENT FOODMART

Jam Food Market, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher V. Langone

Attorney at Langone, Batson & Lavery LLC

17 N. Wabash, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic

1 #3

Exhibit C; License Agreement

1 #4

Exhibit D; License Agreement

1 #5

Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale

1 #2

Exhibit B: Republic Registration

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16505230. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#3

(#3) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Joint status report due by 2/13/2020. Status hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/13/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#4

(#4) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER: Joint status report due by 2/13/2020. Status hearing set for 2/18/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 1/13/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (sxb, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Maria Valdez. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16505230. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.