This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:22:36 (UTC).

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Friends Trading Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Republic Technologies NA , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Friends Trading Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marvin E. Aspen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07991

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marvin E. Aspen

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sream

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC

Sream, Inc.

Defendants

FRIENDS TRADING INC. d/b/a STOP 30

MUHAMMAD SHAMSI

Friends Trading Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher V. Langone

Attorney at Langone, Batson & Lavery LLC

17 N. Wabash, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16505221. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit D; License Agreement

1 #1

Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic

1 #2

Exhibit B: Republic Registration

1 #3

Exhibit C; License Agreement

1 #5

Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 2/13/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials. (jh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED Trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria VA. (jh, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen: Initial status hearing is set for 2/13/2020 at 10:30 a.m. Mailed notice (ags, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Marvin E. Aspen. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (axc, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, Sream ; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16505221. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.