Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:57:08 (UTC).

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC et al v. Broniatowski

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 Republic Technologies NA , LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Broniatowski. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-08294

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rebecca R. Pallmeyer

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SREAM, INC.

Republic Technologies (NA), LLC

Defendants

Pamela Broniatowski

Pamela Broniatowski doing business as Clouds are Us

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Christopher V. Langone

Attorney at Langone, Batson & Lavery LLC

17 N. Wabash, Suite 500

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing previously set for 2/25/2020 is stricken. Civil Case Terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 41(a) (Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

#4

(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 2/25/20 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (bg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#2

(#2) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (bg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #6

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale

1 #4

Exhibit D; License Agreement

1 #3

Exhibit C; License Agreement

1 #2

Exhibit B: Republic Registration

1 #1

Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Pursuant to notice of voluntary dismissal, this case is dismissed without prejudice. Status hearing previously set for 2/25/2020 is stricken. Civil Case Terminated. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by All Plaintiffs without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P 41(a) (Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer: Initial status hearing set for 2/25/20 at 9:00 a.m. Notice mailed by judge's staff (ntf, ) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MAILED to plaintiff(s) counsel Lanham Mediation Program materials (bg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MAILED trademark report to Patent Trademark Office, Alexandria, VA (bg, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sunil R. Harjani. FEE DUE, NO INFORMA PAUPERIS APPLICATION SUBMITTED. Case assignment: Random assignment. (ng, ) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Republic Technologies (NA), LLC, SREAM, INC.; (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Assignment to Republic, #2 Exhibit B: Republic Registration, #3 Exhibit C; License Agreement, #4 Exhibit D; License Agreement, #5 Exhibit E: Product Offered for Sale, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Langone, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Republic Technologies (NA), LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SREAM, INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher V. Langone