This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2020 at 08:29:55 (UTC).

REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS v. OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY et al

Case Summary

On 07/31/2020 REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS filed a Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act lawsuit against OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02092

  • Filing Date:

    07/31/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Freedom Of Information Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS

Defendants

OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

KatieLynn Boyd Townsend

Attorney at REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS

1156 15Th St, Nw, Suite 1020

Washington, DC 20005

Gunita Singh

Attorney at REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS

1156 15Th St, Nw, Suite 1020

Washington, DC 20005

Adam Alexander Marshall

Attorney at REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS

1156 15Th St, Nw, Suite 1020

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

Kathleene A. Molen

Attorney at U.S. ATTORNEY'S OFFICE FOR THE DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA

555 4Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20530

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gunita Singh on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Singh, Gunita) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Time for an Initial Scheduling Conference by OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

6 #6

Exhibit G

6 #5

Exhibit F

6 #4

Exhibit E

6 #3

Exhibit D

6 #2

Exhibit C

6 #1

Exhibit A & B

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

4 #1

Affidavits of Mailing

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/10/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/9/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY served on 8/10/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavits of Mailing)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives of the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/4/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

#2

(#2) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-7409635) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Gunita Singh on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Singh, Gunita) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: Upon consideration of Defendants' unopposed motion to reschedule the initial scheduling conference #8 , the motion is hereby GRANTED. The scheduling conference previously set for October 13, 2020 at 11:15 a.m. is VACATED and RESCHEDULED for October 13, 2020, at 2:00 p.m. to take place telephonically. The parties can obtain a teleconference number and access code from the deputy clerk prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/16/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Unopposed MOTION to Modify the Time for an Initial Scheduling Conference by OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that, on or before October 8, 2020, the parties shall confer and file a joint status report addressing (1) any documents still to be produced pursuant to FOIA; (2) an anticipated schedule for processing and producing any such documents; and (3) any substantive areas of disagreement between the parties. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear telephonically for an Initial Scheduling Conference on October 13, 2020, at 11:15 a.m., before Judge Randolph D. Moss. The parties can obtain a teleconference number and access code from the deputy clerk prior to the conference. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 09/10/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Alexander Marshall on behalf of REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS (Marshall, Adam) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A & B, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G)(Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleene A. Molen on behalf of All Defendants (Molen, Kathleene) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 8/10/20., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 8/10/2020. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 9/9/2020.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY served on 8/10/2020; UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE served on 8/11/2020 (Attachments: #1 Affidavits of Mailing)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 08/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives of the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 8/4/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (4) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF INFORMATION POLICY, UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BDCDC-7409635) filed by REPORTERS COMMITTEE FOR FREEDOM OF THE PRESS. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Civil Cover Sheet, #12 Summons)(Townsend, KatieLynn) (Entered: 07/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less