This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/07/2023 at 08:35:10 (UTC).

Renteria v. Albertson's LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Renteria filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Albertson's LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nevada District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Brenda Weksler and Richard F. Boulware, II. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-02048

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Brenda Weksler

Presiding Judge

Richard F. Boulware, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria

Defendants

Albertson's LLC

Albertson's Stores SUB LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter Mazzeo

Defendant Attorneys

Jacquelyn Michelle Franco

Jack P. Burden

 

Court Documents

13 #2

Exhibit Exhibits 1-3

13 #1

Index Index of Exhibits

13 #13

Main Document

#12

(#12) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#11

(#11) ORDER granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Motions due by 8/28/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#10

(#10) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria.. (Mazzeo, Peter) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

9 #7

Exhibit F

9 #6

Exhibit E

9 #5

Exhibit D

9 #4

Exhibit C

9 #3

Exhibit B

9 #2

Exhibit A

9 #1

Index

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Plaintiff Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria.. (Mazzeo, Peter) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 1

7 #1

Index Index of Exhibits

7 #7

Main Document

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) REPLY to Response to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibits 1-3)(Mazzeo, Peter) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (HAM) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; Discovery due by 7/28/2023. Motions due by 8/28/2023. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/27/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 1/13/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria.. (Mazzeo, Peter) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE to #7 Motion to Remand to State Court by Defendants Albertson's LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC. Replies due by 1/18/2023. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(DRS) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removed Action by Plaintiff Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria.. (Mazzeo, Peter) (Entered: 01/05/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Maria de Jesus Brione Renteria. Responses due by 1/12/2023. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Mazzeo, Peter) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Albertson's LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Minutes of the Court dated December 8, 2022 by Albertson's LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC re #3 Minute Order Removal Case,.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertson's LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Safeway Inc., Other Affiliate Albertson's LLC, Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's Companies, Other Affiliate Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Other Affiliate Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate ABS NV-O, LLC for Albertson's LLC, Albertson's Stores SUB LLC added.. (Burden, Jack) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/9/2022. Statement regarding removed action is due by 12/24/2022. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/8/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket(#2) STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (HAM) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District, Case Number A-22-859477-C, (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANVDC-7141511) by Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover Sheet, #2 Index Index of Exhibits, #3 Errata A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Index M) (Burden, Jack) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less