This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/28/2022 at 09:21:53 (UTC).

Reno v. Anco Insulations Inc, et al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 Reno filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Anco Insulations Inc,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Greg Gerard Guidry and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01991

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Greg Gerard Guidry

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James B Reno

Defendants

Anco Insulations Inc

Eagle Inc.

J. Graves Insulation Company, Inc.

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company

Bayer Cropscience LP

CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC

CIBA-GEIGY Corporation

Cleco Cajun, LLC

Cleco Corporate Holdings, LLC

Georgia-Pacific Consumer Products LP

Hercules, LLC

Melamine Chemicals, Inc.

Uniroyal Inc

CBS Corporation

Riley Power, Inc.

Jacobs Constructors, Inc.

3Rd Party Plaintiff

Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London

3Rd Party Defendant

Uniroyal Holding, Inc.

47 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mickey P. Landry

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Frank J. Swarr

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Matthew C. Clark

Attorney at Landry & Swarr, LLC

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70163

Philip C Hoffman

Attorney at Philip C. Hoffman, LLC

643 Magazine Street, Suite 300 A

New Orleans, LA 70130

3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Paula Marcello Wellons

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1555 Poydras St., Suite 2000

Jonathan B. Womack

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1555 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Paul Jeffrey Verlander

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC

1555 Poydras Street, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Samantha Paula Griffin

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe, APLC

1555 Poydras Street, Ste 2000

New Orleans, LA 70112-4042

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

Thomas Peyton Smith

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Mary Reeves Arthur

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Other Attorneys

Lawrence Pugh, III

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker & Carey

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163

Jacqueline Romero

Attorney at Pugh Accardo Haas Radecker and Carey

1100 Poydras Street, Ste 3600

New Orleans, LA 70163

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Arrowood Indemnity Company dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/15/2022. (ko) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

24 #1

Proposed Order

24 #24

Main Document

#23

(#23) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. re #21 MOTION to Remand. (Smith, Thomas) Modified text/event on 8/10/2022 (mm). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

22 #1

Memorandum in Support

22 #22

Main Document

21 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

21 #1

Memorandum in Support

21 #21

Main Document

1 #9

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #1

Main Document

50 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER granting #24 Motion to Dismiss Party. Party Arrowood Indemnity Company dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 08/15/2022. (ko) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #24 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Arrowood Indemnity Company With Prejudice: 1. Filing attorney should have selected "Yes" at the question "Is this an Exparte/Consent Motion Y/N?" Clerk modified docket text to reflect "Exparte." 2. Filing attorney did not enter additional filers in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filers. (ko) (Entered: 08/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Dismiss Party Arrowood Indemnity Company With Prejudice by Arrowood Indemnity Company, James B Reno. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Romero, Jacqueline) Modified on 8/15/2022 (ko). (Entered: 08/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. re #21 MOTION to Remand. (Smith, Thomas) Modified text/event on 8/10/2022 (mm). (Entered: 08/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) MOTION To Limit State Court Records To Be Filed, and For Extension of Time by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Notice of Submission)(Arthur, Mary) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Remand by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/17/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Notice of Submission)(Griffin, Samantha) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/21/2022. (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case. (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Leave to File Reply Memorandum. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/21/2022. (mm) (Entered: 07/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London re #4 MOTION to Transfer Case. (Griffin, Samantha) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. (Griffin, Samantha) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Continue Submission Date on Uniroyal Holding, Inc.'s 12(B)(6) Motion and Motion to Transfer Case re: rec. docs. 3 & 4 by Certain Underwriters at Lloyd's London. Motion(s) will be submitted on 8/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Notice of Submission)(Griffin, Samantha) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record. IT IS ORDERED that Mary R. Arthur, of the law firm of Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP, be and is hereby enrolled as additional counsel of record for Defendant, Uniroyal Holding, Inc., in the above entitled and referenced matter. Signed by Judge Greg Gerard Guidry on 7/1/2022. (pp) (Entered: 07/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Enroll as Counsel of Record Mary R. Arthur by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Transfer Case by Uniroyal Holding, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Notice of Submission)(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Uniroyal Holding, Inc.. Motion(s) will be submitted on 7/20/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Notice of Submission)(Smith, Thomas) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Greg Gerard Guidry and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (cc) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Civil District Court, Orleans Parish, case number 2020-03366 B-5 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-9423098) filed by Uniroyal Holding, Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleading-Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet) Attorney Thomas Peyton Smith added to party Uniroyal Holding, Inc.(pty:3pd).(Smith, Thomas) Modified text on 7/16/2022 (mm). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CF Industries Nitrogen, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Jacobs Constructors, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where The J. Grave Insulation Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Hercules LLC is a litigant