This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/04/2021 at 09:51:59 (UTC).

Renner v. New York State-People of the State of New York et al

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Renner filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against New York State-People of the State of New York. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Laura Taylor Swain. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-05850

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Laura Taylor Swain

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner

Middletown, NY 10940-0771

Defendants

New York State-People of the State of New York

New York State Court of Appeals

Supreme Court of the State of new York Second Judicial Department

New York State Department of Motor Vehicles

Rockland Psychiatric Center New York State Office of Mental Health

Orange County New York

Orange County District Attorneys Office

Orange County Attorneys Office

Orange County Supreme Court

Orange County Court

Orange County Family Court

Orange County Surrogate Court Staff

Orange County Department of Social Services

Orange County Department of Mental Health

Orange County Correctional Facility

Orange County Sheriffs Department

Orange Regional Medical Center [Garnet Health Medical Center]

Bon Secours Community Hospital

Correct Care Solutions, Inc.

24 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Exhibit

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time (ECF 10) and directs Plaintiff to file an amended complaint, as set forth in the August 2, 2021 order, by October 6, 2021. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff at her address of record and to note service on the docket. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED.. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/30/21) (rdz) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION FOR AN EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT TO REPLEAD PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS THAT COMPIES WITH THE STANDARDS OF 28:1915(e)(2)(B)(ii), re: for Extension of Time to Amend #2 Complaint. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner.(sc) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTransmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #8 Request for Issuance of Summons, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (sc) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER from R. Renner, dated 8/1/21 re: The Pro Se Intake Unit and United States District Court employees denied to divulge your direct email address as a public official. NYLAG a/k/a the New York Legal Assistance Group is in conflict of interest with my federal lawsuit, because of their funding in the form of grants from New York State as primary defendant in my federal complaint etc. In the interest of justice, a competent assistance of counsel must be immediately assigned to answer all legal questions and to support the pending trial with 217 defendant depositions, because I intend to testify as the plaintiff etc. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(sc) Modified on 8/3/2021 (sc). (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York State - People of State of New York Et Alia, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner. (sc) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH LEAVE TO REPLEAD: The Court dismisses the complaint for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) (2)(B)(ii). The Court grants Plaintiff thirty days' leave to replead her claims in an amended complaint that complies with the standards set forth above. The Clerk of Court is instructed to hold this matter open on the docket until a civil judgment is entered. The Court denies Plaintiff's request for preliminary injunctive relief (ECF 4) as moot. The Court also denies Plaintiff's application for the Court to request pro bono counsel (ECF 3) without prejudice to renewal at a later date. The Clerk of Court is directed to transmit a copy of this order to Plaintiff. Plaintiff has consented to receive electronic service of notices and documents in this action. (ECF 6.) The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Motions terminated: #3 APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel, filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 8/2/2021) (sac) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRO SE CONSENT TO RECEIVE ELECTRONIC SERVICE. The following party: Yon Renee Woodson A. Renner consents to receive electronic service via the ECF system. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner.(sc) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION: Leave to proceed in this Court without prepayment of fees is authorized. 28 U.S.C. 1915. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 7/16/2021) (vn) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTIONAND TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER WITHOUT NOTICE filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner..(rdz) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) APPLICATION for the Court to Request Counsel. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner..(rdz) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against Access Supports For Living, Inc., John Philip Asiello, Bon Secours Community Hospital, City of Middletown Municipality, City of Middletown Police Department, Correct Care Solutions, Inc., Janet Marie DiFiore, Mobile Life Support Services, Inc., New York State Court of Appeals, New York State Department of Motor Vehicles, New York State Police Troop F Barrack Headquarters, New York State-People of the State of New York, Orange County Attorneys Office, Orange County Correctional Facility, Orange County Court, Orange County Department of Mental Health, Orange County Department of Social Services, Orange County District Attorneys Office, Orange County Family Court, Orange County New York, Orange County Sheriffs Department, Orange County Supreme Court, Orange County Surrogate Court Staff, Orange Regional Medical Center [Garnet Health Medical Center], Port Jervis City Municipality, Rockland Psychiatric Center New York State Office of Mental Health, Supreme Court of the State of new York Second Judicial Department, The Childrens Rights Society, Inc., The Legal Aid Society of Orange County, Inc., Town of Goshen Municipality, Town of Mount Hope Municipality, Town of Mount Hope Police Department, Town of New Windsor Municipality, Town of New Windsor Police Department, Town of Rochester Municipality, Town of Wallkill Municipality, Town of Wallkill Police Department,, Ulster County Correctional Center, Ulster County District Attorneys Office, Ulster County Public Defenders Office, Ulster County Sheriffs Department, Village of Goshen Municipality, Village of Goshen Police Department. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner..(rdz) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/8/2021: #1 Exhibit) (rdz). (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Yon Renee Woodson Awoonor Renner..(rdz) (Entered: 07/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Orange County New York Department of Health is a litigant

Latest cases where BON SECOURS COMMUNITY HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange County Department of Social Services (DSS) is a litigant

Latest cases where Orange County Correctional Facility's Administration is a litigant