This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:37:56 (UTC).

Renfro v. Harmon et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Renfro filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Harmon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kenneth M Hoyt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04803

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kenneth M Hoyt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Levite Renfro

Houston, TX 77002

Defendants

Aramark

District Atty of Court 176

Judge Nikita V Harmon

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Levite Renfro, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Levite Renfro re: #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM), filed. (lcorbett, 7) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

#3

(#3) CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Levite Renfro. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 1/10/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

3 #1

Appendix

#2

(#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#7

(#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Nikita V Harmon re: #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM), filed. No forwarding address found. (klopez, 7) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice for want of prosecution. Case terminated on 1/27/2020 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Levite Renfro re: #2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening, filed. (CindyMiranda, 5) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

#1

(#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Aramark, District Atty of Court 176, Nikita V Harmon (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Levite Renfro.(agould, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice for want of prosecution. Case terminated on 1/27/2020 (Signed by Judge Kenneth M Hoyt) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Nikita V Harmon re: #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM), filed. No forwarding address found. (klopez, 7) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Levite Renfro re: #2 Notice to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening, filed. (CindyMiranda, 5) (Entered: 12/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned Undeliverable as to Levite Renfro re: #3 Notice of Deficient Pleading (FORM), filed. (lcorbett, 7) (Entered: 12/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING as to Levite Renfro. Parties notified Notice of Compliance due by 1/10/2020, filed. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (bgoolsby, 4) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to Pro Se Litigant of Case Opening. Party notified, filed. (agould, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION/APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Levite Renfro, filed. Motion Docket Date 12/26/2019. (JessicaVillarreal, 3) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Prisoner Civil Rights COMPLAINT against Aramark, District Atty of Court 176, Nikita V Harmon (Filing fee $ 400) filed by Levite Renfro.(agould, 3) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.