This case was last updated from PACER on 01/11/2020 at 05:36:40 (UTC).

Renee Sowell v. Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2020 Renee Sowell filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Fedex Supply Chain, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Kenly Kiya Kato. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00061

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Kenly Kiya Kato

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Renee Sowell

Defendants

DOES 1 through 25, Inclusive

FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Yolanda A Slaughter

Attorney at Law Offices of Yolanda A Slaughter

633 West 5Th Street 26Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Rodney Mesriani

Attorney at Mesriani Law Group

5723 Melrose Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90038

Brandon Chang

Attorney at Mesriani Law Group

5723 Melrose Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90038

Defendant Attorneys

Brandie N Charles

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

Ashley Jane Brick

Attorney at Littler Mendelson PC

2049 Century Park East 5Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067-3107

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1930799 Receipt No: 0973-25081237 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Brick ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #6 Declaration of Constance McGregor ISO Removal) (Attorney Ashley Jane Brick added to party Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft))(Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation identifying FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc.; FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc. is wholly-owned by FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc.; FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc. is wholly-owned by FedEx Logistics, Inc.; and FedEx Logistics, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley Brick

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #5

Exhibit D to Declaration of Ashley Brick

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Renee Sowell; Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:20-cv-00061 FMO (KKx). (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #3

Exhibit B to Declaration of Ashley Brick

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-00061 FMO (KKx). (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit C to Declaration of Ashley Brick

#6

(#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, re Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 01/08/2020. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

1 #6

Declaration of Constance McGregor ISO Removal

1 #1

Declaration of Ashley Brick ISO Removal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case. This case was initially assigned to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 19-03, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:20-cv-00061 FMO (KKx). (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER by Clerk of Court due to incorrect intra-district venue selected by the filer. Case is transferred to the Eastern Division. Case has been assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Any matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to Kenly Kiya Kato. New Case Number 5:20-cv-00061 FMO (KKx). (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • CONFORMED ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc. in San Bernardino Superior Court on 1/6/2020, attached as Exhibit D. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Renee Sowell in San Bernardino Superior Court on 10/15/2019, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, re Corporate Disclosure Statement, #4 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #5 , Notice of Related Case(s) #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 served on 01/08/2020. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation, identifying Plaintiff Renee Sowell; Defendant FedEx Supply Chain, Inc.. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation identifying FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc.; FedEx Supply Chain Holdings, Inc. is wholly-owned by FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc.; FedEx Supply Chain Distribution System, Inc. is wholly-owned by FedEx Logistics, Inc.; and FedEx Logistics, Inc. is a wholly-owned subsidiary of FedEx Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Bernardino Superior Court, case number CIVDS1930799 Receipt No: 0973-25081237 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ashley Brick ISO Removal, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration of Ashley Brick, #6 Declaration of Constance McGregor ISO Removal) (Attorney Ashley Jane Brick added to party Fedex Supply Chain, Inc., a Delaware Corporation(pty:dft))(Brick, Ashley) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less