This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/27/2021 at 09:11:51 (UTC).

Rene Gonzalez v. Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/28/2021 Rene Gonzalez filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christina A. Snyder and Shashi H. Kewalramani. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-01826

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christina A. Snyder

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rene Gonzalez

Defendants

Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC

Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation

Does 1-10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter L Nisson

Attorney at CDLG PC

2973 Harbor Boulevard Suite 594

Costa Mesa, CA 92626-3912

Defendant Attorneys

Robert W Norman, Jr

Attorney at Houser LLP

9970 Research Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

Neil Joseph Cooper

Attorney at Houser LLP

9970 Research Drive

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) REPLY in Support of Unopposed Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

9 #8

Exhibit 8 - First Deed of Trust

9 #7

Exhibit 7 - BK Discharge

9 #6

Exhibit 6 - BK Petition

9 #5

Exhibit 5 - BK Docket

9 #4

Exhibit 4 - Assignment of Deed of Trust

9 #3

Exhibit 3 - Corporate Assignment

9 #2

Exhibit 2 - Deed of Trust

9 #1

Exhibit 1 - Note

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC & Computershare Mortgage Services, LLC dba Computershare Loan Services. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

1 #3

Exhibit C- State Court Removal

1 #2

Exhibit B - State Court Register of Actions

1 #1

Exhibit A - State Court Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPLY in Support of Unopposed Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 12/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #8 filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Note, #2 Exhibit 2 - Deed of Trust, #3 Exhibit 3 - Corporate Assignment, #4 Exhibit 4 - Assignment of Deed of Trust, #5 Exhibit 5 - BK Docket, #6 Exhibit 6 - BK Petition, #7 Exhibit 7 - BK Discharge, #8 Exhibit 8 - First Deed of Trust)(Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. Motion set for hearing on 1/10/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Christina A. Snyder. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 12/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, identifying Specialized Loan Servicing Holdings, LLC & Computershare Mortgage Services, LLC dba Computershare Loan Services. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 10/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #1 . The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Eastern Division Removal Case and Notice re Consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case was initially assigned to District Judge John W. Holcomb and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for discovery. Pursuant to General Order 21-01, this case has been randomly reassigned to District Judge Christina A. Snyder. The case number on all documents filed with the Court in this case should read as follows: 5:21-cv-01826 CAS (SHKx). (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-10, inclusive, Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC, filed by Plaintiff Rene Gonzalez. Filed in State Court on 9/23/2021 Submitted with Attachment 1 Pg. 23 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Riverside Superior Court, case number CVRI2104337 Receipt No: ACACDC-32232684 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation, Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Register of Actions, #3 Exhibit C- State Court Removal) (Attorney Neil Joseph Cooper added to party Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Neil Joseph Cooper added to party Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:dft))(Cooper, Neil) (Entered: 10/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gulf Harbour Investments Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Specialized Loan Servicing LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Neil Joseph Cooper

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert W Norman, Jr